Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Public Works

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082 (SB0224)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Cottage City Public Works Building
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0229
Title
Interstate Compact on Washington Area Professional Football Team Franchise Facility Incentives
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0331 /CH0109
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0409
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Service Charges PG/MC 112-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0483 (SB0382)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Seat Pleasant City Hall and Public Works Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0609 /CH0089 (SB0360)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0665
Title
Baltimore City – Department of Public Works – Frozen–Pipe Prevention Rebate Program
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858 /CH0481 (SB0251/CH0482)
Title
Minority Business Enterprises - Required Regulations - Liquidated Damages Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0977
Title
State Highway Administration Neighbor Notification Act
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1102 /CH0115
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority - Enterprise Fund
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1321 /CH0099 (SB0889)
Title
Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Delegate Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1354 /CH0117
Title
Calvert County - Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428
Title
Environment - Stormwater Management Infrastructure - Historic Districts
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1560
Title
Baltimore City Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Bill Dispute Process, Billing Program Review, and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0224 (HB0082)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Cottage City Public Works Building
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360 (HB0609/CH0089)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382 (HB0483)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Seat Pleasant City Hall and Public Works Facilities
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0849
Title
Beach Erosion Control District - Ocean City Life-Saving Station Museum
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 /CH0350 (HB0989)
Title
Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0889 (HB1321/CH0099)
Title
Washington County – Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1098 /CH0714
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water Liens
Sponsor
Senator Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1192
Title
Baltimore County - Development Impact Fees - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1224
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0082 (SB0224) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Cottage City Public Works Building Delegate Tarlau 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 11:00 AM
HB0229 Interstate Compact on Washington Area Professional Football Team Franchise Facility Incentives Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0331 /CH0109 St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 109
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0409 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Service Charges PG/MC 112-18 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0483 (SB0382) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Seat Pleasant City Hall and Public Works Facilities Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0609 /CH0089 (SB0360) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0665 Baltimore City – Department of Public Works – Frozen–Pipe Prevention Rebate Program Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0858 /CH0481 (SB0251/CH0482) Minority Business Enterprises - Required Regulations - Liquidated Damages Prohibition Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 481
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0977 State Highway Administration Neighbor Notification Act Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1102 /CH0115 Calvert County - Bonding Authority - Enterprise Fund Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1321 /CH0099 (SB0889) Washington County - Public Facilities Bonds Delegate Corderman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1354 /CH0117 Calvert County - Bonding Authority Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Appropriations
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1428 Environment - Stormwater Management Infrastructure - Historic Districts Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1560 Baltimore City Department of Public Works - Water and Sewer Bill Dispute Process, Billing Program Review, and Report Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
SB0224 (HB0082) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Cottage City Public Works Building Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 9:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 9:00 AM
SB0360 (HB0609/CH0089) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB0382 (HB0483) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Seat Pleasant City Hall and Public Works Facilities Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 3:00 PM
SB0849 Beach Erosion Control District - Ocean City Life-Saving Station Museum Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0877 /CH0350 (HB0989) Promoting ext-Raordinary Innovation in Maryland's Economy (PRIME Act) President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 350
Budget and Taxation
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Ways and Means
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0889 (HB1321/CH0099) Washington County – Public Facilities Bonds Washington County Senators 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2018 - 1:15 PM
SB1098 /CH0714 Baltimore City - Tax Sales - Water Liens Senator Robinson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 714
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1192 Baltimore County - Development Impact Fees - Authorization Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1224 Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Modifications Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM