Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Public Works

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0024
Title
Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028 /CH0236 (SB0939/CH0237)
Title
Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0303
Title
Interstate Compact on Washington Area Professional Football Team Franchise Facility Incentives
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0325 /CH0162
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Indirect Customer Assistance Program MC/PG 105-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0358 /CH0180
Title
St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0449 /CH0657 (SB0451/CH0658)
Title
Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0524 /CH0663 (SB0300/CH0009)
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574 (SB0376/CH0184)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623 /CH0096
Title
Calvert County - Local Debt Bonding Authority
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1220
Title
Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Rose
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0040
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Modifications
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0300 /CH0009 (HB0524/CH0663)
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0376 /CH0184 (HB0574)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0451 /CH0658 (HB0449/CH0657)
Title
Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 /CH0237 (HB0028/CH0236)
Title
Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0024 Procurement - Public Work Contracts - Contractor Occupational Safety and Health Requirements Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
1/24/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0028 /CH0236 (SB0939/CH0237) Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2019 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0303 Interstate Compact on Washington Area Professional Football Team Franchise Facility Incentives Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0325 /CH0162 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Indirect Customer Assistance Program MC/PG 105-19 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0358 /CH0180 St. Mary's County - Public Facility Bonds St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 180
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0449 /CH0657 (SB0451/CH0658) Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 657
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0524 /CH0663 (SB0300/CH0009) Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees Delegate Wilson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 663
Economic Matters
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0574 (SB0376/CH0184) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0623 /CH0096 Calvert County - Local Debt Bonding Authority Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 96
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1220 Sewerage Systems - Residential Major Subdivisions in Tier III and Tier IV Areas Delegate Rose 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0040 Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Modifications Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/31/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0300 /CH0009 (HB0524/CH0663) Prevailing Wage Rates - Public Work Contracts - Suits by Employees Senator Benson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 9
Finance
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0376 /CH0184 (HB0574) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bonds Carroll County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 184
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0451 /CH0658 (HB0449/CH0657) Baltimore County – Development Impact Fees – Authorization and Use of Funds Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Budget and Taxation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0939 /CH0237 (HB0028/CH0236) Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2019 - 10:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM