Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Property (Q1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0149
Title
State Property Tax - Homestead Property Tax Assessment Cap Reduction
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161
Title
Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0259
Title
Personal Property Tax - Maximum Rate - Small Business
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0335
Title
Property Tax - Credits for Property in Neighborhood Conservation Area
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0366
Title
Tax Sales - Delinquent Water Bills - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0446
Title
Personal Property Tax - Exemption - Small Business
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0480 (SB0590)
Title
Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2015
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0497 /CH0253 (SB0356)
Title
Property Tax - Exemption - Low Income Housing - Ownership by Limited Liability Company
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0644
Title
Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals and Veterans
Sponsor
Delegate Metzgar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0651
Title
Personal Property Reports - Exemption and Affidavit
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0690
Title
Property Tax Fairness Act of 2015 (Strengthening Maryland Municipalities)
Sponsor
Delegate Krimm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0959
Title
Real Property Tax - Phased In Value - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0996 (SB0375)
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Application Requirement - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1035 /CH0114 (SB0439)
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Oaks
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1091 (SB0134)
Title
Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to Counties
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144
Title
Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177
Title
Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 425-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1275
Title
Property Tax - Homeowner's Tax Credit - Computation and Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0134 (HB1091)
Title
Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to Counties
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0197
Title
Municipalities - Vacant and Blighted Buildings
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0356 (HB0497/CH0253)
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Exemption - Low Income Housing
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0375 (HB0996)
Title
Homestead Property Tax Credit - Application Requirement - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0439 (HB1035/CH0114)
Title
Baltimore City - Tax Sales
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0590 (HB0480)
Title
Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2015
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0698
Title
Property Tax - Valuation of Real Property - Internet Database
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0149 State Property Tax - Homestead Property Tax Assessment Cap Reduction Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0161 Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0259 Personal Property Tax - Maximum Rate - Small Business Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0335 Property Tax - Credits for Property in Neighborhood Conservation Area Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0366 Tax Sales - Delinquent Water Bills - Prohibition Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0446 Personal Property Tax - Exemption - Small Business Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0480 (SB0590) Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2015 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0497 /CH0253 (SB0356) Property Tax - Exemption - Low Income Housing - Ownership by Limited Liability Company Delegate Anderson 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0644 Property Tax Credit - Elderly Individuals and Veterans Delegate Metzgar 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0651 Personal Property Reports - Exemption and Affidavit Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0690 Property Tax Fairness Act of 2015 (Strengthening Maryland Municipalities) Delegate Krimm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0959 Real Property Tax - Phased In Value - Definition Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0996 (SB0375) Homestead Property Tax Credit - Application Requirement - Repeal Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1035 /CH0114 (SB0439) Baltimore City - Tax Sales Delegate Oaks 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 114
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1091 (SB0134) Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to Counties Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1144 Tax Sales - Reimbursement for Expenses Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1177 Prince George's County - Tax Sales - Limited Auction and Foreclosure for Abandoned Property PG 425-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1275 Property Tax - Homeowner's Tax Credit - Computation and Eligibility Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0134 (HB1091) Open Space Incentive Program - Payments to Counties Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0197 Municipalities - Vacant and Blighted Buildings Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0356 (HB0497/CH0253) Baltimore City - Property Tax Exemption - Low Income Housing Senator McFadden 4 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0375 (HB0996) Homestead Property Tax Credit - Application Requirement - Repeal Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0439 (HB1035/CH0114) Baltimore City - Tax Sales Senator McFadden 4 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0590 (HB0480) Small Business Personal Property Tax Relief Act of 2015 President 3 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0698 Property Tax - Valuation of Real Property - Internet Database Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM