Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Property - Local (Q2)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0160 (SB0122/CH0404)
Title
Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0183 /CH0157
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit for Security Camera Systems PG 413-19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0188 /CH0158
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Credits - Grocery Stores PG 409-19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0223
Title
Prince George's County - Property Tax Credits - Teachers PG 410-19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0243 /CH0117 (SB0214/CH0118)
Title
Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Cumberland Economic Development Corporation
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553 (SB0324)
Title
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Websites
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642
Title
Montgomery County - Uniformity of Property Tax Assessments - Use of Pesticides by Country Clubs and Golf Courses MC 11-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0651
Title
Montgomery County - Country Clubs and Golf Courses - Rate of Assessment and Term of Agreements MC 27-19
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit Supplement
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0888
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Revitalization Districts
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1090 /CH0299 (SB0284/CH0300)
Title
9-1-1 Specialists - Compensation and Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1173
Title
Baltimore City Police Officers - Incentives for Purchase of Dwelling in Baltimore City
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1390 /CH0383
Title
Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Low-Income Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122 /CH0404 (HB0160)
Title
Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics Programs
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0214 /CH0118 (HB0243/CH0117)
Title
Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Cumberland Economic Development Corporation
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284 /CH0300 (HB1090/CH0299)
Title
9-1-1 Specialists - Compensation and Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324 (HB0553)
Title
Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Websites
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1019
Title
Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Rural Legacy Program
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0160 (SB0122/CH0404) Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics Programs Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0183 /CH0157 Prince George's County - Property Tax Credit for Security Camera Systems PG 413-19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0188 /CH0158 Prince George's County - Property Tax Credits - Grocery Stores PG 409-19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 158
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0223 Prince George's County - Property Tax Credits - Teachers PG 410-19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-0)
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0243 /CH0117 (SB0214/CH0118) Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Cumberland Economic Development Corporation Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 117
Ways and Means
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0553 (SB0324) Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Websites Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0642 Montgomery County - Uniformity of Property Tax Assessments - Use of Pesticides by Country Clubs and Golf Courses MC 11-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0651 Montgomery County - Country Clubs and Golf Courses - Rate of Assessment and Term of Agreements MC 27-19 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0887 Baltimore County - Property Tax - Homeowners' Property Tax Credit Supplement Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0888 Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Revitalization Districts Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1090 /CH0299 (SB0284/CH0300) 9-1-1 Specialists - Compensation and Benefits Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 299
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1173 Baltimore City Police Officers - Incentives for Purchase of Dwelling in Baltimore City Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1390 /CH0383 Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit - Low-Income Employees Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Ways and Means
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2019 - 2:30 PM
SB0122 /CH0404 (HB0160) Property Tax Credits - Real Property Used for Robotics Programs Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2019 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0214 /CH0118 (HB0243/CH0117) Allegany County - Property Tax Credit - Cumberland Economic Development Corporation Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2019 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0284 /CH0300 (HB1090/CH0299) 9-1-1 Specialists - Compensation and Benefits Senator Kagan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Finance
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0324 (HB0553) Political Subdivisions - Legal Notice Requirements - Posting on Websites Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1019 Anne Arundel County - Property Tax Credit - Rural Legacy Program Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:16 PM