Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Sales and Use (Q4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0261 (SB0574)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Bottled Water - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0594
Title
Prince George's County - New School Construction Investment Act of 2015 PG 413-15
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0726
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Online Sales Presumption
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0875 (SB0665)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0903
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption for Precious Metal Bullion and Coins - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0928
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Agricultural Products and Equipment - Repeal of Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0958 (SB0447)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - Hunting and Sporting Goods
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0964
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Snack Food - Application
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065 (SB0190)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Accommodations
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1233 (SB0763/CH0050)
Title
Tax Amnesty Program
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0190 (HB1065)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Accommodations
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0447 (HB0958)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - Hunting and Sporting Goods
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0574 (HB0261)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Bottled Water - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0665 (HB0875)
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 /CH0050 (HB1233)
Title
Tax Amnesty Program
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Nonprofit Organizations Authorized to Perform Auxiliary Library Services
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0261 (SB0574) Sales and Use Tax - Bottled Water - Exemption Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0594 Prince George's County - New School Construction Investment Act of 2015 PG 413-15 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0726 Sales and Use Tax - Online Sales Presumption Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0875 (SB0665) Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0903 Sales and Use Tax - Exemption for Precious Metal Bullion and Coins - Repeal Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0928 Sales and Use Tax - Agricultural Products and Equipment - Repeal of Exemption Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0958 (SB0447) Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - Hunting and Sporting Goods Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0964 Sales and Use Tax - Snack Food - Application Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1065 (SB0190) Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Accommodations Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1233 (SB0763/CH0050) Tax Amnesty Program Delegate Walker 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0190 (HB1065) Sales and Use Tax - Taxable Price - Accommodations Senator Madaleno 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 3 of 2016
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0447 (HB0958) Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - Hunting and Sporting Goods Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0574 (HB0261) Sales and Use Tax - Bottled Water - Exemption Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0665 (HB0875) Sales and Use Tax - Tax-Free Periods - University and College Textbooks Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0763 /CH0050 (HB1233) Tax Amnesty Program Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0789 Sales and Use Tax - Exemption - Nonprofit Organizations Authorized to Perform Auxiliary Library Services Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM