Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Transportation (Q5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0116
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0165
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Short-Term Vehicle Rentals - Rates
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0406 (SB0870)
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0756 (SB0520/CH0397)
Title
Washington County - Board of Education - Motor Fuel Tax Exemption
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0986 /CH0728
Title
Vehicle Laws - Trade-In Allowance - Leased Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1042
Title
Vehicle Laws - Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1290
Title
Motor Fuel Dispensing Equipment - Tax Rate Information
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1588
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Refund - Demand Response Trips
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0520 /CH0397 (HB0756)
Title
County Boards of Education - School Buses - Motor Fuel Tax Exemption and Refund
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0870 (HB0406)
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0116 Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0165 Sales and Use Tax - Short-Term Vehicle Rentals - Rates Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0406 (SB0870) Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition Delegate Jameson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0756 (SB0520/CH0397) Washington County - Board of Education - Motor Fuel Tax Exemption Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0986 /CH0728 Vehicle Laws - Trade-In Allowance - Leased Vehicles Delegate Beidle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 728
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1042 Vehicle Laws - Excise Tax - Leased Vehicles Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1290 Motor Fuel Dispensing Equipment - Tax Rate Information Delegate Adams 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2016 - 1:30 PM
HB1588 Motor Fuel Tax Refund - Demand Response Trips Delegate Howard, C. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0196 Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0520 /CH0397 (HB0756) County Boards of Education - School Buses - Motor Fuel Tax Exemption and Refund Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0870 (HB0406) Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM