Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Transportation (Q5)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0055 /CH0238 (SB0054)
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0110
Title
Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0406 /CH0362 (SB0315)
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0627 /CH0522
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Refund - Demand Response Trips
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911
Title
Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1360 (SB0449/CH0663)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0054 (HB0055/CH0238)
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0284
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0315 (HB0406/CH0362)
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0393 /CH0363
Title
Clean Cars Act of 2017
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0449 /CH0663 (HB1360)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0055 /CH0238 (SB0054) Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition Delegate Jameson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0110 Electric Vehicles and Recharging Equipment - Rebates and Tax Credits - Extension Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0406 /CH0362 (SB0315) Clean Cars Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0627 /CH0522 Motor Fuel Tax Refund - Demand Response Trips Delegate Howard, C. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 522
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0911 Motor Fuel Tax Rates - Consumer Price Index Adjustment - Repeal Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1360 (SB0449/CH0663) Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption Delegate Hixson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0054 (HB0055/CH0238) Motor Fuel Tax - Aviation Gasoline - Definition Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-0)
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2017 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0284 Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0315 (HB0406/CH0362) Clean Cars Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0393 /CH0363 Clean Cars Act of 2017 Senator Manno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0449 /CH0663 (HB1360) Estates and Trusts - Vehicle Transfers - Excise Tax and Fee Exemption Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 663
Budget and Taxation
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM