Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 (SB0531)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0970 (SB0689/CH0047)
Title
Prince George's County - Transfer Tax - Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1178 /CH0301
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemption - Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of Trust
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 (HB0911)
Title
Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0689 /CH0047 (HB0970)
Title
Prince George's County - Transfer Tax - Deputy Sheriffs
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0766 /CH0197
Title
Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Rate Determination
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0911 (SB0531) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0970 (SB0689/CH0047) Prince George's County - Transfer Tax - Deputy Sheriffs Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1178 /CH0301 Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemption - Purchase Money Mortgage or Purchase Money Deed of Trust Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0531 (HB0911) Marijuana Control and Revenue Act of 2015 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0689 /CH0047 (HB0970) Prince George's County - Transfer Tax - Deputy Sheriffs Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 47
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0766 /CH0197 Agricultural Land Transfer Tax - Rate Determination Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM