Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Recordation and Transfer (Q6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0010
Title
Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Gaines
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0044
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0447 /CH0621
Title
Charles County - County Transfer Tax - Revenue Received by the Clerk of the Circuit Court
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1085
Title
Prince George's County - State and County Transfer Taxes - Exemptions PG 429-16
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226 /CH0224 (SB0597/CH0223)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274 (SB0836)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1464 (SB0927)
Title
Program Open Space Trust Fund Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Gaines
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0597 /CH0223 (HB1226/CH0224)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0836 (HB1274)
Title
Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0927 (HB1464)
Title
Program Open Space Trust Fund Act of 2016
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0010 Transfer Tax Repayment - Use of Funds Delegate Gaines 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB0044 Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions - Property Conveyed From Sole Proprietorship to Limited Liability Company Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2016 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0447 /CH0621 Charles County - County Transfer Tax - Revenue Received by the Clerk of the Circuit Court Charles County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1085 Prince George's County - State and County Transfer Taxes - Exemptions PG 429-16 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1226 /CH0224 (SB0597/CH0223) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - Exemptions Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Ways and Means
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1274 (SB0836) Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1464 (SB0927) Program Open Space Trust Fund Act of 2016 Delegate Gaines 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0597 /CH0223 (HB1226/CH0224) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Controlling Interest - Exemptions Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0836 (HB1274) Housing and Community Development - Community Development Program Act Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0927 (HB1464) Program Open Space Trust Fund Act of 2016 Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM