Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0034
Title
Income Tax Return Preparers - False Returns or Claims for Refund - Statute of Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184
Title
Estate and Inheritance Taxes - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0186
Title
Estate Tax - Recoupling With Federal Law
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0188 (SB0155)
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0276
Title
Estate Tax - Qualified Family-Owned Business Interests - Exclusion
Sponsor
Delegate Afzali
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0351
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0443 (SB0589)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525
Title
Estate Tax - Qualified Agricultural Property - Repeal of Recapture Provisions
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 (SB0625)
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0686 (SB0423)
Title
Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0739 /CH0612 (SB0602)
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0741 /CH0533 (SB0601/CH0532)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bohanan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1085
Title
Maryland-Mined Coal Tax Credit - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1214
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Exclusion - Deceased Spousal Unused Exclusion Amount
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1492
Title
Communications Tax Reform Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0039
Title
Back Taxes - No Penalty, No Interest
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0155 (HB0188)
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit and Exclusion Amount
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0244
Title
Inheritance Tax - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0324
Title
Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0423 (HB0686)
Title
Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0535
Title
Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0589 (HB0443)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601 /CH0532 (HB0741/CH0533)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0602 (HB0739/CH0612)
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0625 (HB0554)
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Transfer of Qualified Agricultural Property by a Qualified Recipient
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1011
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Exclusion - Deceased Spousal Unused Exclusion Amount
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0034 Income Tax Return Preparers - False Returns or Claims for Refund - Statute of Limitations Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0184 Estate and Inheritance Taxes - Repeal Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0186 Estate Tax - Recoupling With Federal Law Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0188 (SB0155) Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit Delegate Schulz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0276 Estate Tax - Qualified Family-Owned Business Interests - Exclusion Delegate Afzali 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0351 Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0443 (SB0589) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0525 Estate Tax - Qualified Agricultural Property - Repeal of Recapture Provisions Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0554 (SB0625) Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0686 (SB0423) Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0739 /CH0612 (SB0602) Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 612
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0741 /CH0533 (SB0601/CH0532) Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program Delegate Bohanan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB1085 Maryland-Mined Coal Tax Credit - Repeal Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1214 Maryland Estate Tax - Exclusion - Deceased Spousal Unused Exclusion Amount Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1492 Communications Tax Reform Act of 2014 Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0039 Back Taxes - No Penalty, No Interest Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
SB0155 (HB0188) Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0163 Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit and Exclusion Amount Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0244 Inheritance Tax - Repeal Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0324 Estate Tax - Unified Credit Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0423 (HB0686) Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0535 Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0589 (HB0443) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 PM
Finance
SB0601 /CH0532 (HB0741/CH0533) Business and Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program Senator Miller 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0602 (HB0739/CH0612) Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit President 6 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0625 (HB0554) Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 2:30 PM
SB0892 Maryland Estate Tax - Transfer of Qualified Agricultural Property by a Qualified Recipient Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1011 Maryland Estate Tax - Exclusion - Deceased Spousal Unused Exclusion Amount Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM