Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0108 (SB0037)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0122
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of State and Local Taxes on Small Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0148
Title
Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0221 (SB0073)
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0290 /CH0236
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit Holders - Comptroller Notification and Attendance Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0291 /CH0237
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Wine Shippers - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0333
Title
Electronic Bingo and Electronic Tip Jars - Distribution of Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0676 (SB0002)
Title
Higher Education Investment Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723
Title
Maryland-Mined Coal Tax Credit - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0730
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768
Title
Tax Procedure - Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0826 (SB0178/CH0018)
Title
Estate Tax - Alternative Payment Schedule - Penalty Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827 /CH0282
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Taxes - Wine Tax Revenue Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0828 /CH0104 (SB0177)
Title
Estate Tax - Filing of Tax Returns
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991
Title
Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1233 (SB0763/CH0050)
Title
Tax Amnesty Program
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0004
Title
Moratorium on Taxes and Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 (HB0676)
Title
Higher Education Investment Tax Credit Program
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0037 (HB0108)
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 (HB0221)
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0177 (HB0828/CH0104)
Title
Estate Tax - Filing of Tax Returns
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0178 /CH0018 (HB0826)
Title
Estate Tax - Alternative Payment Schedule - Penalty Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0265 /CH0334
Title
Calvert County - Electronic Bingo and Electronic Tip Jars - Distribution of Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0661
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0707 /CH0049
Title
Alcoholic Beverage Tax Returns - Manufacturers and Wholesalers - Due Date
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0712
Title
Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 /CH0050 (HB1233)
Title
Tax Amnesty Program
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0108 (SB0037) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0122 Task Force to Study the Impact of State and Local Taxes on Small Businesses Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0148 Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0221 (SB0073) Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0290 /CH0236 Alcoholic Beverages - Winery Off-Site Permit Holders - Comptroller Notification and Attendance Restrictions Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0291 /CH0237 Alcoholic Beverages - Direct Wine Shippers - Reporting Requirements Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Economic Matters
2/23/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0333 Electronic Bingo and Electronic Tip Jars - Distribution of Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0676 (SB0002) Higher Education Investment Tax Credit Program Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0723 Maryland-Mined Coal Tax Credit - Repeal Delegate Washington, A. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0730 Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0768 Tax Procedure - Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Hearing cancelled
Ways and Means
HB0826 (SB0178/CH0018) Estate Tax - Alternative Payment Schedule - Penalty Prohibition Delegate Hixson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0827 /CH0282 Alcoholic Beverage Taxes - Wine Tax Revenue Distribution Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0828 /CH0104 (SB0177) Estate Tax - Filing of Tax Returns Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Ways and Means
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/31/2015 - 2:00 PM
HB0991 Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1233 (SB0763/CH0050) Tax Amnesty Program Delegate Walker 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Ways and Means
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HJ0004 Moratorium on Taxes and Regulations Delegate McKay 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/09/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0002 (HB0676) Higher Education Investment Tax Credit Program Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0037 (HB0108) Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
Finance
SB0073 (HB0221) Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Budget and Taxation
2/04/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0177 (HB0828/CH0104) Estate Tax - Filing of Tax Returns Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0178 /CH0018 (HB0826) Estate Tax - Alternative Payment Schedule - Penalty Prohibition Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 18
Budget and Taxation
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0265 /CH0334 Calvert County - Electronic Bingo and Electronic Tip Jars - Distribution of Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 334
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0661 Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0707 /CH0049 Alcoholic Beverage Tax Returns - Manufacturers and Wholesalers - Due Date Senator Eckardt 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0712 Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0763 /CH0050 (HB1233) Tax Amnesty Program Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Budget and Taxation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM