Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0198 /CH0293
Title
Inheritance Tax – Perpetual Conservation Easement – Farming Purposes – Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0308 /CH0021 (SB0646/CH0015)
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0964
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption for School Field Trips
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1227
Title
Tax Credit - Commuter Benefits - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1352
Title
Task Force on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness (Maryland Taxpayer Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1370 (SB0956)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Beer and Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371
Title
Recordation Tax - Collection by State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1374
Title
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1399 (SB0833)
Title
Task Force on the Regulation of Caterers
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1459 /CH0118
Title
Calvert County – Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1541 (SB0994)
Title
Disclosure of Tax Benefits - Nonprofit Hospitals
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1707
Title
Inheritance Tax - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0083 /CH0652
Title
Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Return Deadline
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107
Title
Public Safety - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0428
Title
Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0561
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0565
Title
Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0646 /CH0015 (HB0308/CH0021)
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833 (HB1399)
Title
Imposition of Sales Tax on Caterers
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0956 (HB1370)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Beer and Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0961 /CH0420
Title
Calvert County - Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues
Sponsor
Calvert County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0980
Title
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0994 (HB1541)
Title
Disclosure of Tax Benefits - Nonprofit Hospitals
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0198 /CH0293 Inheritance Tax – Perpetual Conservation Easement – Farming Purposes – Exemption Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 293
Ways and Means
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0308 /CH0021 (SB0646/CH0015) Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit Delegate Tarlau 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 21
Ways and Means
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0964 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption for School Field Trips Delegate Folden 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1227 Tax Credit - Commuter Benefits - Alterations Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1352 Task Force on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness (Maryland Taxpayer Protection Act) Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1370 (SB0956) Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Beer and Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1371 Recordation Tax - Collection by State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Distribution Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1374 Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1399 (SB0833) Task Force on the Regulation of Caterers Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1459 /CH0118 Calvert County – Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1541 (SB0994) Disclosure of Tax Benefits - Nonprofit Hospitals Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1707 Inheritance Tax - Repeal Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0083 /CH0652 Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Return Deadline Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2018 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0107 Public Safety - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center - Reporting Requirements Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (119-0)
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0428 Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds Senator Bates 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0561 Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0565 Interest Rate on Tax Deficiencies and Refunds Senator Serafini 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0646 /CH0015 (HB0308/CH0021) Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit Senator Madaleno 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 15
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 (HB1399) Imposition of Sales Tax on Caterers Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0956 (HB1370) Alcoholic Beverages - Maryland Beer and Brewery Promotion Program - Establishment Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Economic Matters
SB0961 /CH0420 Calvert County - Youth Recreational Opportunities Fund and Distribution From Admissions and Amusement Tax Revenues Calvert County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0980 Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0994 (HB1541) Disclosure of Tax Benefits - Nonprofit Hospitals Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM