Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135 (SB0465)
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Electronic Bingo and Tip Jars - Distribution to Maryland State Arts Council
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0185 (SB0223)
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0219
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Portability
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0256
Title
Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0400
Title
Tax - General - Vaping Product Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0436
Title
Task Force on the Economic Future of Western Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525
Title
Phase Out Company Giveaways Act
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0695 (SB0002)
Title
Digital Advertising Gross Revenues - Taxation
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0697
Title
Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732
Title
Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765
Title
Maryland Tax Revision Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0919 (SB0902)
Title
Coal - Tax Credits and Exemption - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 (SB0865)
Title
Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Credit for Purchase of Maryland-Mined Coal - Extension
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1058
Title
Office of the Comptroller - Tax Enforcement - Determination of Residency
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284
Title
State Tax Credits, Exemptions, and Deductions - Alterations and Repeal (Tax Modernization Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1535
Title
Comptroller - Duties - Designations of and Responses to Personal Representatives
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1585 (SB0389)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Extension and Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0002 (HB0695)
Title
Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003
Title
Electronic Smoking Devices, Other Tobacco Products, and Cigarettes - Taxation and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0223 (HB0185)
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389 (HB1585)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Extension and Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0465 (HB0135)
Title
Maryland E–Nnovation Initiative Program and Admissions and Amusement Tax Distributions – Extensions and Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0865 (HB0969)
Title
Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Credit for Purchase of Maryland-Mined Coal - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0902 (HB0919)
Title
Coal – Tax Credits and Exemption – Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987
Title
Racing and Community Development Act of 2020
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0135 (SB0465) Admissions and Amusement Tax - Electronic Bingo and Tip Jars - Distribution to Maryland State Arts Council Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0185 (SB0223) Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0219 Maryland Estate Tax - Portability Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/04/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0256 Maryland Estate Tax - Unified Credit Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0400 Tax - General - Vaping Product Tax Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
Economic Matters
HB0436 Task Force on the Economic Future of Western Maryland Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/07/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0525 Phase Out Company Giveaways Act Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0695 (SB0002) Digital Advertising Gross Revenues - Taxation Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0697 Inheritance Tax - Exemption - Nieces and Nephews Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB0732 Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Budget and Taxation
HB0765 Maryland Tax Revision Commission Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0919 (SB0902) Coal - Tax Credits and Exemption - Repeal Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB0969 (SB0865) Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Credit for Purchase of Maryland-Mined Coal - Extension Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1056 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-1)
Ways and Means
2/25/2020 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB1058 Office of the Comptroller - Tax Enforcement - Determination of Residency Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/21/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1284 State Tax Credits, Exemptions, and Deductions - Alterations and Repeal (Tax Modernization Act) Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
3/05/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1535 Comptroller - Duties - Designations of and Responses to Personal Representatives Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
HB1585 (SB0389) Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Extension and Alterations Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
3/10/2020 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0002 (HB0695) Taxation – Tobacco Tax, Sales and Use Tax, and Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0003 Electronic Smoking Devices, Other Tobacco Products, and Cigarettes - Taxation and Regulation Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0223 (HB0185) Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/29/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0389 (HB1585) Economic Development - Maryland E-Nnovation Initiative Program - Extension and Alterations Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0465 (HB0135) Maryland E–Nnovation Initiative Program and Admissions and Amusement Tax Distributions – Extensions and Alterations Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/12/2020 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0865 (HB0969) Public Service Company Franchise Tax - Credit for Purchase of Maryland-Mined Coal - Extension Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0902 (HB0919) Coal – Tax Credits and Exemption – Repeal Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2020 - 1:00 PM
SB0987 Racing and Community Development Act of 2020 Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/25/2020 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/24/2020 8:04 AM