Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323 /CH0312 (SB0613/CH0311)
Title
Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - Transient Charge
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409 /CH0456
Title
Anne Arundel County - Collection of Hotel Taxes and Distribution of Revenues - City of Annapolis
Sponsor
Anne Arundel County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0613 /CH0311 (HB0323/CH0312)
Title
Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - Transient Charge
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0323 /CH0312 (SB0613/CH0311) Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - Transient Charge Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Ways and Means
2/06/2014 - 2:15 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1409 /CH0456 Anne Arundel County - Collection of Hotel Taxes and Distribution of Revenues - City of Annapolis Anne Arundel County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0613 /CH0311 (HB0323/CH0312) Frederick County - Hotel Rental Tax - Transient Charge Senator Brinkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2014 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM