Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0386 /CH0444
Title
Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 12-17
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 /CH0119 (SB0297/CH0120)
Title
St. Mary's County - Tax Exemptions - Repeal of Local Provisions
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0624 (SB0506)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Agricultural Tourism
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1030 (SB0846/CH0597)
Title
Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion and Operations
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1181
Title
Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1286
Title
Harford County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations in Municipal Corporations
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1638
Title
Employee Ownership Trusts
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1650
Title
Harford County - Hotel Rental Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0297 /CH0120 (HB0431/CH0119)
Title
St. Mary's County - Tax Exemptions - Repeal of Local Provisions
Sponsor
Senator Waugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0506 (HB0624)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Agricultural Tourism
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0846 /CH0597 (HB1030)
Title
Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion and Operations
Sponsor
Senator Conway
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0386 /CH0444 Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 12-17 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0431 /CH0119 (SB0297/CH0120) St. Mary's County - Tax Exemptions - Repeal of Local Provisions St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Ways and Means
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0624 (SB0506) Anne Arundel County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Agricultural Tourism Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1030 (SB0846/CH0597) Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion and Operations Delegate Anderson 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Ways and Means
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1181 Economic Development - Municipal Corporations - Community Revitalization and Improvement Zones Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1286 Harford County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Limitations in Municipal Corporations Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1638 Employee Ownership Trusts Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1650 Harford County - Hotel Rental Tax Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0297 /CH0120 (HB0431/CH0119) St. Mary's County - Tax Exemptions - Repeal of Local Provisions Senator Waugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Budget and Taxation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0506 (HB0624) Anne Arundel County - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Agricultural Tourism Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0846 /CH0597 (HB1030) Baltimore City - Hotel Room Tax - Convention Center Promotion and Operations Senator Conway 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:32 PM