Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Queen Anne's County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0287 /CH0306 (SB0461/CH0305)
Title
Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0673 (SB0022)
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1036 (SB0634)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Compass Regional Hospice
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037 (SB0434)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Talisman Therapeutic Riding Farm
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022 (HB0673)
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0434 (HB1037)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Talisman Therapeutic Riding Farm
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0461 /CH0305 (HB0287/CH0306)
Title
Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0634 (HB1036)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Compass Regional Hospice
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1056 /CH0606
Title
Rural Health Collaborative Pilot
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0287 /CH0306 (SB0461/CH0305) Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 306
Economic Matters
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0673 (SB0022) Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1036 (SB0634) Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Compass Regional Hospice Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1037 (SB0434) Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Talisman Therapeutic Riding Farm Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0022 (HB0673) Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0434 (HB1037) Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Talisman Therapeutic Riding Farm Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
SB0461 /CH0305 (HB0287/CH0306) Selling or Providing Alcoholic Beverages to Individuals With Intellectual Disabilities and Others – Repeal of Prohibition Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 305
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0634 (HB1036) Creation of a State Debt - Queen Anne's County - Compass Regional Hospice Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
SB1056 /CH0606 Rural Health Collaborative Pilot Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 606
Finance
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM