Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Transportation - Highways (R1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0247
Title
Vehicle Laws - Road Rage Reduction Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Hogan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0252 (SB0158)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits - Interstate 68
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0389 /CH0397 (SB0730)
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - All-Electronic Tolling - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Rudolph
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0852
Title
Highways - Scenic Byways - Signs
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0873 (SB1001)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Divided Highways - Speed Limits and Crosswalks
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0878 /CH0430 (SB0814)
Title
State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0911 (SB0677)
Title
Public Safety - Highway Work Zones - Off-Duty Law Enforcement Officers Required
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0980
Title
Transportation - Roadway Near High Voltage Electric Transmission Line in Prince George's County - Limitation PG 407-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1061
Title
Transportation - Interstate 95 Link to Roadways or Property Near the University of Maryland, College Park - Spending Prohibited PG 406-14
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - E-ZPass Discount Plans - Removal of Time Limitations
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1263
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1454
Title
Winter Driving Safety Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0158 (HB0252)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits - Interstate 68
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677 (HB0911)
Title
Public Safety - Highway Work Zones - Off-Duty Law Enforcement Officers Required
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0697
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Electronic Toll Collection - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730 (HB0389/CH0397)
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - All-Electronic Tolling - Study
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0814 (HB0878/CH0430)
Title
State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0928
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway - Toll Plazas
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941
Title
Transportation - Advertising Signs on State Highways for Agricultural Businesses Authorized
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1001 (HB0873)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Divided Highways - Crosswalks
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0247 Vehicle Laws - Road Rage Reduction Act of 2014 Delegate Hogan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0252 (SB0158) Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits - Interstate 68 Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0389 /CH0397 (SB0730) Maryland Transportation Authority - All-Electronic Tolling - Study Delegate Rudolph 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 397
Ways and Means
2/06/2014 - 2:15 PM
Finance
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0852 Highways - Scenic Byways - Signs Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0873 (SB1001) Vehicle Laws - Divided Highways - Speed Limits and Crosswalks Delegate Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Senate Refuses to Recede
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0878 /CH0430 (SB0814) State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Environmental Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/19/2014 - 1:45 PM
HB0911 (SB0677) Public Safety - Highway Work Zones - Off-Duty Law Enforcement Officers Required Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0980 Transportation - Roadway Near High Voltage Electric Transmission Line in Prince George's County - Limitation PG 407-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
HB1061 Transportation - Interstate 95 Link to Roadways or Property Near the University of Maryland, College Park - Spending Prohibited PG 406-14 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
HB1177 Maryland Transportation Authority - E-ZPass Discount Plans - Removal of Time Limitations Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1263 Maryland Transportation Authority - Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Toll Collection Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1454 Winter Driving Safety Act Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0158 (HB0252) Vehicle Laws - Maximum Speed Limits - Interstate 68 Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/23/2014 - 2:00 PM
SB0677 (HB0911) Public Safety - Highway Work Zones - Off-Duty Law Enforcement Officers Required Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0697 Maryland Transportation Authority - Electronic Toll Collection - Procedures Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0730 (HB0389/CH0397) Maryland Transportation Authority - All-Electronic Tolling - Study Senator Jacobs 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0814 (HB0878/CH0430) State Highway Administration - Compost and Compost-Based Products - Specification Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0928 Maryland Transportation Authority - John F. Kennedy Memorial Highway - Toll Plazas Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0941 Transportation - Advertising Signs on State Highways for Agricultural Businesses Authorized Senator Dyson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1001 (HB0873) Vehicle Laws - Divided Highways - Crosswalks Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM