Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0047
Title
Operating a Vehicle or Vessel - Injury to Others While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0157 /CH0518
Title
Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182
Title
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0630
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Reinstatement of Revoked License
Sponsor
Delegate Vallario
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0735 (SB0763)
Title
Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0773 /CH0630 (SB1008)
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Evidence of Blood Test
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0864 (SB0302)
Title
Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive Damages
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974
Title
Serious and Subsequent Offenders - Conditions for Reinstatement of Driver's License
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306
Title
Habitual Drunk Driver - Mandatory Minimum Penalty and Vehicle Forfeiture
Sponsor
Delegate Ciliberti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1342 (SB0945/CH0512)
Title
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1364 (SB1039)
Title
Drugged Driving or Operation of Vessel - Polysubstance Abuse
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1367 (SB0970)
Title
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1393
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving - Mandatory Minimum Sentences
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0152
Title
Driving Records - Expungement - Refusal to Submit to Chemical Test for Intoxication
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0160 /CH0517
Title
Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0302 (HB0864)
Title
Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive Damages
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0763 (HB0735)
Title
Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0945 /CH0512 (HB1342)
Title
Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0970 (HB1367)
Title
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1008 (HB0773/CH0630)
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Evidence of Blood Test
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 (HB1364)
Title
Drugged Driving or Operation of Vessel - Polysubstance Abuse
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0047 Operating a Vehicle or Vessel - Injury to Others While Under the Influence of or Impaired by Alcohol or Drugs Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0157 /CH0518 Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0182 Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Injury - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0630 Drunk and Drugged Driving - Reinstatement of Revoked License Delegate Vallario 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0735 (SB0763) Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0773 /CH0630 (SB1008) Drunk and Drugged Driving - Evidence of Blood Test Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0864 (SB0302) Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive Damages Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0974 Serious and Subsequent Offenders - Conditions for Reinstatement of Driver's License Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1306 Habitual Drunk Driver - Mandatory Minimum Penalty and Vehicle Forfeiture Delegate Ciliberti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1342 (SB0945/CH0512) Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law) Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1364 (SB1039) Drugged Driving or Operation of Vessel - Polysubstance Abuse Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1367 (SB0970) Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1393 Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving - Mandatory Minimum Sentences Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0152 Driving Records - Expungement - Refusal to Submit to Chemical Test for Intoxication Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0160 /CH0517 Death or Life-Threatening Injury by Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Subsequent Offenders - Penalties Senator Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0302 (HB0864) Aggressive Drunk Driving - Punitive Damages Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0763 (HB0735) Manslaughter and Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0945 /CH0512 (HB1342) Drunk Driving Reduction Act of 2016 (Noah's Law) Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 512
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0970 (HB1367) Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1008 (HB0773/CH0630) Drunk and Drugged Driving - Evidence of Blood Test Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1039 (HB1364) Drugged Driving or Operation of Vessel - Polysubstance Abuse Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:29 PM