Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028 (SB0443)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032 (SB0442)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Tinted Windows
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0126 (SB0723)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Seat Belt Use - Exemption for Individuals Delivering Printed Publications
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0205
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0246 /CH0091 (SB0389)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0277
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0666 (SB0640)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0677
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Request for Exhaust Emissions Test After Failing On-Board Diagnostics Test
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0678
Title
Motor Vehicles - Stopping on Shoulder - Warning Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087
Title
Motor Vehicles - Prohibition Against Unattended Motor Vehicle - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1230
Title
Vehicle Laws - Signal Devices on Personal Vehicles - Fire Police
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1241
Title
Motor Vehicles - Use of Headlights When Windshield Wipers Operating - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1246 /CH0450 (SB0771)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 /CH0003
Title
Vehicle Laws - Preventive Maintenance Program - Preventive Maintenance Technician
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0072 /CH0013
Title
Motor Vehicles - Weight and Axle Load Limits
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0086 /CH0127
Title
Vehicle Laws - Size, Weight, and Axle Load Limits
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0378 /CH0294
Title
Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389 (HB0246/CH0091)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442 (HB0032)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Tinted Windows
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0443 (HB0028)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 (HB0666)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0723 (HB0126)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Seat Belt Use - Exemption for Individuals Delivering Printed Publications
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0771 (HB1246/CH0450)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Robey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0028 (SB0443) Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and Penalties Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/29/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0032 (SB0442) Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Tinted Windows Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0126 (SB0723) Vehicle Laws - Seat Belt Use - Exemption for Individuals Delivering Printed Publications Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0205 Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - Definition Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0246 /CH0091 (SB0389) Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - Procedures Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 91
Environmental Matters
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0277 Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Delegate Ready 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 2:15 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2014 - 2:15 PM
HB0666 (SB0640) Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0677 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Request for Exhaust Emissions Test After Failing On-Board Diagnostics Test Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0678 Motor Vehicles - Stopping on Shoulder - Warning Devices Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1087 Motor Vehicles - Prohibition Against Unattended Motor Vehicle - Exception Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1230 Vehicle Laws - Signal Devices on Personal Vehicles - Fire Police Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1241 Motor Vehicles - Use of Headlights When Windshield Wipers Operating - Enforcement Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1246 /CH0450 (SB0771) Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - Establishment Delegate Malone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 450
Environmental Matters
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0006 /CH0003 Vehicle Laws - Preventive Maintenance Program - Preventive Maintenance Technician Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 3
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0072 /CH0013 Motor Vehicles - Weight and Axle Load Limits Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 13
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0086 /CH0127 Vehicle Laws - Size, Weight, and Axle Load Limits Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0378 /CH0294 Vehicle Laws - Electric Bicycle - Definition Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 294
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0389 (HB0246/CH0091) Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates for Used Vehicles - Procedures Senator Robey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0442 (HB0032) Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Vehicles - Tinted Windows Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0443 (HB0028) Vehicle Laws - Hidden Compartments - Prohibition and Penalties Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0640 (HB0666) Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0723 (HB0126) Vehicle Laws - Seat Belt Use - Exemption for Individuals Delivering Printed Publications Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0771 (HB1246/CH0450) Motor Vehicles - Exceptional Milk Hauling Permit - Establishment Senator Robey 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM