Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0097 (SB0125)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Window Tinting Restrictions - Medical Exemption for Vehicle Owner's Family
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0233 /CH0080
Title
Motor Vehicles - Calculation of Length - Loading Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0454 (SB0664)
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0506 (SB0410/CH0168)
Title
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Safety
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0917 /CH0287 (SB0716)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0125 (HB0097)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Window Tinting Restrictions - Medical Exemption for Vehicle Owner's Family
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0410 /CH0168 (HB0506)
Title
Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Safety
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 (HB0454)
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0716 (HB0917/CH0287)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0097 (SB0125) Vehicle Laws - Window Tinting Restrictions - Medical Exemption for Vehicle Owner's Family Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0233 /CH0080 Motor Vehicles - Calculation of Length - Loading Devices Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0454 (SB0664) Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0506 (SB0410/CH0168) Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Safety Delegate Anderson 4 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0917 /CH0287 (SB0716) Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0125 (HB0097) Vehicle Laws - Window Tinting Restrictions - Medical Exemption for Vehicle Owner's Family Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0410 /CH0168 (HB0506) Baltimore City - Vehicle Laws - Traffic Safety Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0664 (HB0454) Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0716 (HB0917/CH0287) Motor Vehicles - Checkpoints - Prohibition on Targeting Motorcycles Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM