Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 /CH0608
Title
Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Authorized Uses and Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0229 /CH0256
Title
Commercial Motor Vehicles - Operation - Transportation Emergencies
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0294 (SB0232)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Lamps and Lights - Use When Windshield Wipers Operating
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0373
Title
Motor Vehicles - Passenger Seat Belt Requirement - Primary Offense
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0479
Title
Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Transport Vehicles - Seat Belts
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0482
Title
Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Transport Vehicles - Recording Equipment
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0486
Title
Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural Products
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0547
Title
Motor Vehicles - Tires, Exterior Lights, and Windshield Wipers - Biennial Inspection
Sponsor
Delegate Turner
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0635
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Recall or Remediation - Documentation of Repairs
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0662
Title
Emergency Vehicles - Blood, Organ, or Tissue Delivery Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0698 (SB0573)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Gross Weight and Axle Load - Poultry
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0805 (SB0774/CH0231)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0848
Title
Vehicle Laws - Causing Diesel Emissions to Discharge Onto Another - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1236 /CH0457 (SB0969/CH0456)
Title
Vehicle Equipment - Counterfeit and Nonfunctional Airbags - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1356
Title
Motor Vehicles - Vehicle Event Data Recorders
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1473
Title
Public Schools - School Vehicles - Three-Point Seat Belts
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0125
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183
Title
School Vehicles - Seat Belts - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0196
Title
Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0232 (HB0294)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Lamps and Lights - Use When Windshield Wipers Operating
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0573 (HB0698)
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of Hauling Grain, Poultry, and Dairy on State Highways
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0635
Title
Vehicle Laws - Flashing Lights - Community-Based Emergency Response Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0774 /CH0231 (HB0805)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0969 /CH0456 (HB1236/CH0457)
Title
Vehicle Equipment - Counterfeit and Nonfunctional Airbags - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 /CH0608 Vehicle Laws - Historic Motor Vehicles - Authorized Uses and Inspections Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Environment and Transportation
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0229 /CH0256 Commercial Motor Vehicles - Operation - Transportation Emergencies Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0294 (SB0232) Motor Vehicles - Lamps and Lights - Use When Windshield Wipers Operating Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2016 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0373 Motor Vehicles - Passenger Seat Belt Requirement - Primary Offense Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0479 Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Transport Vehicles - Seat Belts Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0482 Vehicle Laws - Law Enforcement Transport Vehicles - Recording Equipment Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0486 Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural Products Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0547 Motor Vehicles - Tires, Exterior Lights, and Windshield Wipers - Biennial Inspection Delegate Turner 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0635 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Recall or Remediation - Documentation of Repairs Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0662 Emergency Vehicles - Blood, Organ, or Tissue Delivery Vehicles Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0698 (SB0573) Motor Vehicles - Gross Weight and Axle Load - Poultry Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0805 (SB0774/CH0231) Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements Delegate Beidle 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0848 Vehicle Laws - Causing Diesel Emissions to Discharge Onto Another - Prohibition Delegate Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1236 /CH0457 (SB0969/CH0456) Vehicle Equipment - Counterfeit and Nonfunctional Airbags - Prohibitions Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
HB1356 Motor Vehicles - Vehicle Event Data Recorders Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1473 Public Schools - School Vehicles - Three-Point Seat Belts Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0125 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program - Exemptions Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0183 School Vehicles - Seat Belts - Requirements Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0196 Vehicle-Miles-Traveled Tax and Associated Mandated Devices - Prohibition Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
SB0232 (HB0294) Motor Vehicles - Lamps and Lights - Use When Windshield Wipers Operating Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0573 (HB0698) Task Force to Study the Impact of Hauling Grain, Poultry, and Dairy on State Highways Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0635 Vehicle Laws - Flashing Lights - Community-Based Emergency Response Vehicles Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0774 /CH0231 (HB0805) Motor Vehicles - Autocycles - Standards and Requirements Senator Norman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0969 /CH0456 (HB1236/CH0457) Vehicle Equipment - Counterfeit and Nonfunctional Airbags - Prohibitions Senator Brochin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:30 PM