Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Vehicle Laws - Equipment and Inspections (R6)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0178 (SB0408)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Race and Speed Contests - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0250
Title
Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519 (SB0445)
Title
Vehicle Equipment - Safety Glass - Replacement Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1315 (SB0681)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0408 (HB0178)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Reckless Driving, Speed Contests, Registration Plates, and Noise Abatement - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0445 (HB0519)
Title
Vehicle Equipment - Safety Glass - Replacement Standards
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0586
Title
Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Exemptions – Older Drivers
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681 (HB1315)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0178 (SB0408) Vehicle Laws - Race and Speed Contests - Penalties Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0250 Commercial Motor Vehicles - Inspections Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/18/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0519 (SB0445) Vehicle Equipment - Safety Glass - Replacement Standards Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1315 (SB0681) Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0408 (HB0178) Vehicle Laws - Reckless Driving, Speed Contests, Registration Plates, and Noise Abatement - Penalties Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0445 (HB0519) Vehicle Equipment - Safety Glass - Replacement Standards Senator West 2 2 In the House - Second Reading Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0586 Vehicle Emissions Inspection Program – Exemptions – Older Drivers Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0681 (HB1315) Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2021 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 11:17 PM
Click to return on the top page