Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0016
Title
Vehicle Laws - Baltimore City - Prohibition on Sale of Dirt Bikes
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 (SB0778)
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0288
Title
Vehicle Laws - Regulation of Parking - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292
Title
Baltimore County - Regulation of Parking on York Road
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0339 (SB0413/CH0127)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0717
Title
Vehicle Laws - Evidence of Required Security - Carrying While Operating Vehicle
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0812 /CH0281
Title
Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles - Access to Farms
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1078 (SB0559)
Title
Vehicle Law - Dealers' Facilities - Internet Locations
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1130
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1241 /CH0122
Title
Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls and Related Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1269 (SB0917)
Title
Maryland Salvage Advertising Act
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0413 /CH0127 (HB0339)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0559 (HB1078)
Title
Vehicle Law - Dealers' Facilities - Internet Locations
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0682
Title
Electric Vehicles - Use of High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes - Reciprocity With Virginia
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0714 /CH0378
Title
Maryland Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council - Reporting and Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0778 (HB0172)
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Serafini
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0917 (HB1269)
Title
Maryland Salvage Advertising Act
Sponsor
Senator DeGrange
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0016 Vehicle Laws - Baltimore City - Prohibition on Sale of Dirt Bikes Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/28/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0172 (SB0778) Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0288 Vehicle Laws - Regulation of Parking - Jurisdiction Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0292 Baltimore County - Regulation of Parking on York Road Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0339 (SB0413/CH0127) Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting Requirements Delegate Carter 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0717 Vehicle Laws - Evidence of Required Security - Carrying While Operating Vehicle Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0812 /CH0281 Vehicle Laws - All-Terrain Vehicles - Access to Farms Delegate Hornberger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 281
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1078 (SB0559) Vehicle Law - Dealers' Facilities - Internet Locations Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1130 Vehicle Laws - Driving Without a License or While License is Suspended - Penalties Delegate Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1241 /CH0122 Maryland Transportation Authority - Payment of Tolls and Related Fees Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Environment and Transportation
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1269 (SB0917) Maryland Salvage Advertising Act Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0413 /CH0127 (HB0339) Vehicle Laws - Race-Based Traffic Stops - Policy and Reporting Requirements Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0559 (HB1078) Vehicle Law - Dealers' Facilities - Internet Locations Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0682 Electric Vehicles - Use of High Occupancy Vehicle (HOV) Lanes - Reciprocity With Virginia Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0714 /CH0378 Maryland Electric Vehicle Infrastructure Council - Reporting and Sunset Extension Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378
Finance
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0778 (HB0172) Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles Senator Serafini 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0917 (HB1269) Maryland Salvage Advertising Act Senator DeGrange 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:28 PM