Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Racing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0300 (SB1108)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0660
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Equestrian Day
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0704
Title
Off-Track Betting - Maryland State Fairgrounds - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0707 /CH0195 (SB0372/CH0194)
Title
Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727 /CH0496
Title
Horse Racing - Satellite Simulcast Betting - Public Hearing Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0815 /CH0497 (SB1116)
Title
Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing Authorization
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0965 /CH0727
Title
The Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentive Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1644 /CH0315
Title
Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Racetrack License
Sponsor
Delegate West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0372 /CH0194 (HB0707/CH0195)
Title
Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1108 (HB0300)
Title
Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1116 (HB0815/CH0497)
Title
Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0300 (SB1108) Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0660 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Equestrian Day Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0704 Off-Track Betting - Maryland State Fairgrounds - Prohibition Delegate West 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0707 /CH0195 (SB0372/CH0194) Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 195
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0727 /CH0496 Horse Racing - Satellite Simulcast Betting - Public Hearing Requirements Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 496
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0815 /CH0497 (SB1116) Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing Authorization Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Ways and Means
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0965 /CH0727 The Maryland International and Preakness Stakes Incentive Act of 2016 Delegate Walker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 727
Ways and Means
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1644 /CH0315 Baltimore County - Alcoholic Beverages - Racetrack License Delegate West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Economic Matters
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0372 /CH0194 (HB0707/CH0195) Study of Intercepting Horse Racing Winnings for Child Support and Restitution Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Finance
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1108 (HB0300) Video Lottery Terminals - Disposition of Unclaimed Winnings Senator Salling 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
3/17/2016 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 AM
SB1116 (HB0815/CH0497) Horse Racing - Fair Hill - Arabian Breed Racing Authorization Senator Norman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM