Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Radiation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218 /CH0359
Title
Physician Assistants - Performance of X-Ray Duties
Sponsor
Delegate George
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0312 /CH0457 (SB0334/CH0456)
Title
Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0536 (SB0738)
Title
Health Occupations - Magnetic Resonance Imaging Services - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0625 (SB0614)
Title
Environment - Dental Radiation Machines - Maintenance and Inspections
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0798 (SB0608)
Title
Environment - Radiation Sources - Podiatry and Chiropractic Radiation Machines
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0980 /CH0588 (SB0954/CH0587)
Title
Maryland Board of Physicians - Authority to Issue Temporary Licenses and Radiation Therapy, Radiography, Nuclear Medicine Technology, and Radiology Assistance Advisory Committee
Sponsor
Delegate Turner, V.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1096 /CH0401 (SB0672)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117
Title
Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Mandatory Coverage - Medical and Hospital Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Donoghue
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0334 /CH0456 (HB0312/CH0457)
Title
Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - Notification
Sponsor
Senator Jones-Rodwell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0488
Title
Tanning Devices - Use by Minors - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0608 (HB0798)
Title
Environment - Radiation Sources - Podiatry and Chiropractic Radiation Machines
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0614 (HB0625)
Title
Environment - Dental Radiation Machines - Maintenance and Inspections
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 (HB1096/CH0401)
Title
State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Senator Conway
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0738 (HB0536)
Title
Health Occupations - Magnetic Resonance Imaging Services - Study
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0954 /CH0587 (HB0980/CH0588)
Title
Maryland Board of Physicians - Authority to Issue Temporary Licenses and Radiation Therapy, Radiography, Nuclear Medicine Technology, and Radiology Assistance Advisory Committee
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0218 /CH0359 Physician Assistants - Performance of X-Ray Duties Delegate George 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 359
Health and Government Operations
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0312 /CH0457 (SB0334/CH0456) Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - Notification Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 457
Health and Government Operations
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0536 (SB0738) Health Occupations - Magnetic Resonance Imaging Services - Study Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0625 (SB0614) Environment - Dental Radiation Machines - Maintenance and Inspections Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0798 (SB0608) Environment - Radiation Sources - Podiatry and Chiropractic Radiation Machines Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0980 /CH0588 (SB0954/CH0587) Maryland Board of Physicians - Authority to Issue Temporary Licenses and Radiation Therapy, Radiography, Nuclear Medicine Technology, and Radiology Assistance Advisory Committee Delegate Turner, V. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 588
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1096 /CH0401 (SB0672) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Delegate Hammen 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 401
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1117 Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Mandatory Coverage - Medical and Hospital Benefits Delegate Donoghue 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0334 /CH0456 (HB0312/CH0457) Mammograms - Dense Breast Tissue - Notification Senator Jones-Rodwell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 456
Finance
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0488 Tanning Devices - Use by Minors - Prohibition Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0608 (HB0798) Environment - Radiation Sources - Podiatry and Chiropractic Radiation Machines Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0614 (HB0625) Environment - Dental Radiation Machines - Maintenance and Inspections Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0672 (HB1096/CH0401) State Board of Physicians and Allied Health Advisory Committees - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation Senator Conway 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0738 (HB0536) Health Occupations - Magnetic Resonance Imaging Services - Study Senator Dyson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0954 /CH0587 (HB0980/CH0588) Maryland Board of Physicians - Authority to Issue Temporary Licenses and Radiation Therapy, Radiography, Nuclear Medicine Technology, and Radiology Assistance Advisory Committee Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 587
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM