Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Raffles

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0069 /CH0007 (SB0006/CH0006)
Title
Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0344 (SB0130)
Title
Harford County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0414 /CH0228 (SB0315/CH0227)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Permits
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499 /CH0419 (SB1039)
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 /CH0006 (HB0069/CH0007)
Title
Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0130 (HB0344)
Title
Harford County - Charitable Gaming
Sponsor
Senator Glassman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0315 /CH0227 (HB0414/CH0228)
Title
Frederick County - Gaming Permits
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 (HB1499/CH0419)
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0069 /CH0007 (SB0006/CH0006) Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 7
Ways and Means
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/20/2013 - 1:15 PM
HB0344 (SB0130) Harford County - Charitable Gaming Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0414 /CH0228 (SB0315/CH0227) Frederick County - Gaming Permits Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 228
Ways and Means
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB1499 /CH0419 (SB1039) Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013 Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0006 /CH0006 (HB0069/CH0007) Dorchester County - Restriction on Sunday Gaming - Repeal Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 6
Budget and Taxation
1/30/2013 - 3:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0130 (HB0344) Harford County - Charitable Gaming Senator Glassman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0315 /CH0227 (HB0414/CH0228) Frederick County - Gaming Permits Senator Brinkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1039 (HB1499/CH0419) Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013 President 6 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM