Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Railroads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0573
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0619
Title
Election Law - Campaign Contributions Made by Public Service Companies - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0835
Title
Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1123
Title
Maryland Economic Development Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1326 (SB0754)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1427
Title
Task Force to Study Expanding Metrorail Service in Southern Prince George's County
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0565
Title
Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754 (HB1326)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1035
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - MARC Penn Line Extension
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0573 Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0619 Election Law - Campaign Contributions Made by Public Service Companies - Prohibition Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0835 Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1123 Maryland Economic Development Act of 2014 Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1326 (SB0754) Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/10/2014 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
HB1427 Task Force to Study Expanding Metrorail Service in Southern Prince George's County Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0565 Criminal Law - Motor Vehicles - Criminal Negligence Resulting in Death Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0754 (HB1326) Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1035 Maryland Transit Administration - MARC Penn Line Extension Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM