Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Railroads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0381
Title
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534 /CH0136 (SB0098)
Title
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1426
Title
Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0098 (HB0534/CH0136)
Title
Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0963
Title
Transportation - Transit Service - State Grants
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0381 Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew Delegate McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0534 /CH0136 (SB0098) Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque Delegate Parrott 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1426 Calvert County - Personal Property Tax - Exemption Delegate Fisher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0098 (HB0534/CH0136) Railroad Grade Crossings - Exempt Highway-Rail Grade Crossing Plaque Senator Reilly 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Finance
1/25/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0963 Transportation - Transit Service - State Grants Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM