Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Railroads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0066 (SB0252)
Title
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0201 (SB0319/CH0420)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0209
Title
Privately Owned Transportation Projects - Construction and Authorization to Use State-Owned Rights-of-Way and Property - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0559
Title
Railroad Companies - Condemnation Authority - Application
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0763
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Coordination of Public Transportation Network
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765 (SB0914)
Title
Transportation - Magnetic Levitation Projects - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857
Title
Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0858
Title
Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0903
Title
Watershed Protection and Restoration Programs - Impervious Surface - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1202
Title
State Income and Property Tax Credits - Privately Operated Mass Transportation Project
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1235 (SB0702)
Title
Healthy Climate Initiative
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1257 (SB0931)
Title
Maryland Transportation Public-Private Partnership Oversight Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1296 (SB0200)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
Sponsor
Delegate Chang
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0200 (HB1296)
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0252 (HB0066)
Title
Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 /CH0011 (HB0166/CH0010)
Title
Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0319 /CH0420 (HB0201)
Title
Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702 (HB1235)
Title
Healthy Climate Initiative
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0914 (HB0765)
Title
Transportation - Magnetic Levitation Projects - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0931 (HB1257)
Title
Maryland Transportation Public-Private Partnership Oversight Act
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0066 (SB0252) Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew Delegate Stein 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0201 (SB0319/CH0420) Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees) Delegate Korman 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0209 Privately Owned Transportation Projects - Construction and Authorization to Use State-Owned Rights-of-Way and Property - Requirements Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0559 Railroad Companies - Condemnation Authority - Application Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0763 Maryland Transit Administration - Coordination of Public Transportation Network Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0765 (SB0914) Transportation - Magnetic Levitation Projects - Requirements Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0857 Personal Property Tax - Investments in Maryland Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0858 Personal Property Tax - Exemption for Business Personal Property Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0903 Watershed Protection and Restoration Programs - Impervious Surface - Definition Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1202 State Income and Property Tax Credits - Privately Operated Mass Transportation Project Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Ways and Means
HB1235 (SB0702) Healthy Climate Initiative Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1257 (SB0931) Maryland Transportation Public-Private Partnership Oversight Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1296 (SB0200) State Finance and Procurement - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Delegate Chang 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0200 (HB1296) State Finance and Procurement - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0252 (HB0066) Railroad Company - Movement of Freight - Required Crew Senator Hayes 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0280 /CH0011 (HB0166/CH0010) Labor and Employment – Payment of Wages – Minimum Wage (Fight for Fifteen) Senator McCray 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 11
Finance
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0319 /CH0420 (HB0201) Maryland Transit Administration – State Employees – Free Ridership (Transit Benefit for State Employees) Senator Augustine 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 420
Finance
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0702 (HB1235) Healthy Climate Initiative Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0914 (HB0765) Transportation - Magnetic Levitation Projects - Requirements Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0931 (HB1257) Maryland Transportation Public-Private Partnership Oversight Act Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:33 PM