Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Real Estate -see also- Agents and Brokers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0017
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Continuing Education - Comparative Law Course
Sponsor
Delegate McConkey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0356 /CH0243 (SB0254)
Title
Department of General Services - Deep Creek Lake Buy Down Area Program - Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0511 /CH0428
Title
Real Property - Residential Property - Ground Leases
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0697
Title
Life Insurers - Reserve Investments - Loans Secured by Real Estate
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0721 (SB0568)
Title
Real Estate Appraisers - Appraisal Agreement - Required Copies
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0829 (SB0570)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit or Lot - Limitation on Fees
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1028 /CH0113 (SB0203)
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Real Estate Salespersons and Brokers - Formation of Business Entities and Payment of Commissions
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1056 /CH0115 (SB0610)
Title
Real Estate Brokers and Salespersons - Continuing Education - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1183 /CH0472 (SB0649)
Title
Real Property - Contract for Sale of New Home
Sponsor
Delegate Knotts
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1195 (SB0877)
Title
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1227 /CH0121
Title
Real Estate Appraisers - Licensing and Certification - Examination Waiver Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1236
Title
Real Estate Brokers - Licensing - Experience Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Vaughn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0203 (HB1028/CH0113)
Title
Business Occupations and Professions - Real Estate Salespersons and Brokers - Formation of Business Entities and Payment of Commissions
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0252
Title
Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0254 (HB0356/CH0243)
Title
Department of General Services - Deep Creek Lake Buy Down Area Program - Extension
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325 /CH0025
Title
Life Insurers - Reserve Investments - Loans Secured by Real Estate
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0568 (HB0721)
Title
Real Estate Appraisers - Appraisal Agreement - Required Copies
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0570 (HB0829)
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0610 (HB1056/CH0115)
Title
Real Estate Brokers and Salespersons - Continuing Education - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0649 (HB1183/CH0472)
Title
Real Property - Contract for Sale of New Home
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0877 (HB1195)
Title
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0909 /CH0207
Title
Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Financing Purchase or Lease of Property by Other Entities
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0017 State Real Estate Commission - Continuing Education - Comparative Law Course Delegate McConkey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
HB0356 /CH0243 (SB0254) Department of General Services - Deep Creek Lake Buy Down Area Program - Extension Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
HB0511 /CH0428 Real Property - Residential Property - Ground Leases Delegate Holmes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 428
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0697 Life Insurers - Reserve Investments - Loans Secured by Real Estate Delegate Davis 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Health and Government Operations
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0721 (SB0568) Real Estate Appraisers - Appraisal Agreement - Required Copies Delegate Vaughn 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Economic Matters
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0829 (SB0570) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1007 Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit or Lot - Limitation on Fees Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1028 /CH0113 (SB0203) Business Occupations and Professions - Real Estate Salespersons and Brokers - Formation of Business Entities and Payment of Commissions Delegate Branch 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1056 /CH0115 (SB0610) Real Estate Brokers and Salespersons - Continuing Education - Requirements Delegate Vaughn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 115
Economic Matters
2/27/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1183 /CH0472 (SB0649) Real Property - Contract for Sale of New Home Delegate Knotts 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 472
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
HB1195 (SB0877) Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015 Delegate Robinson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1227 /CH0121 Real Estate Appraisers - Licensing and Certification - Examination Waiver Requirements Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Economic Matters
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1236 Real Estate Brokers - Licensing - Experience Requirement Delegate Vaughn 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0203 (HB1028/CH0113) Business Occupations and Professions - Real Estate Salespersons and Brokers - Formation of Business Entities and Payment of Commissions Senator Conway 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0252 Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0254 (HB0356/CH0243) Department of General Services - Deep Creek Lake Buy Down Area Program - Extension Senator Edwards 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
SB0325 /CH0025 Life Insurers - Reserve Investments - Loans Secured by Real Estate Senator Pugh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Finance
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0568 (HB0721) Real Estate Appraisers - Appraisal Agreement - Required Copies Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0570 (HB0829) Condominiums - Warranty Claims Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0610 (HB1056/CH0115) Real Estate Brokers and Salespersons - Continuing Education - Requirements Senator Pinsky 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0649 (HB1183/CH0472) Real Property - Contract for Sale of New Home Senator Muse 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/08/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0877 (HB1195) Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015 Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0909 /CH0207 Tri-County Council for Southern Maryland - Financing Purchase or Lease of Property by Other Entities Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM