Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Real Estate -see also- Agents and Brokers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0055
Title
Business Occupations – Obligations of Real Estate Brokers – Voter Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0064 /CH0759
Title
Business Occupations - Real Estate Appraisers - Payment by Real Estate Appraisal Management Companies
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0091
Title
Natural Resources - Hunting - Outerwear Exception
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0200 /CH0160 (SB0064/CH0159)
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0363 (SB0305)
Title
More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0596 (SB0234/CH0470)
Title
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1470
Title
Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Water and Sewer Billing
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1481 /CH0680 (SB0648/CH0681)
Title
Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1482 /CH0078 (SB0846/CH0077)
Title
State Real Estate Commission – Brokers – Business Succession in the Event of Disability
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1608
Title
Real Property - Trust Money - Escrow Trust Accounts
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0064 /CH0159 (HB0200/CH0160)
Title
State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 /CH0470 (HB0596)
Title
Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0305 (HB0363)
Title
More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0648 /CH0681 (HB1481/CH0680)
Title
Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0846 /CH0077 (HB1482/CH0078)
Title
State Real Estate Commission – Brokers – Business Succession in the Event of Disability
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0055 Business Occupations – Obligations of Real Estate Brokers – Voter Registration Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0064 /CH0759 Business Occupations - Real Estate Appraisers - Payment by Real Estate Appraisal Management Companies Delegate Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 759
Economic Matters
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0091 Natural Resources - Hunting - Outerwear Exception Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
1/24/2018 - 1:30 PM
HB0200 /CH0160 (SB0064/CH0159) State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Economic Matters
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0363 (SB0305) More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0596 (SB0234/CH0470) Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB1470 Baltimore City - Landlord and Tenant - Water and Sewer Billing Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1481 /CH0680 (SB0648/CH0681) Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 680
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1482 /CH0078 (SB0846/CH0077) State Real Estate Commission – Brokers – Business Succession in the Event of Disability Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 78
Economic Matters
3/09/2018 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1608 Real Property - Trust Money - Escrow Trust Accounts Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0064 /CH0159 (HB0200/CH0160) State Commission of Real Estate Appraisers, Appraisal Management Companies, and Home Inspectors - Membership Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Finance
1/11/2018 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0234 /CH0470 (HB0596) Physicians - Licensure - Grounds for Discipline and Interstate Medical Licensure Compact Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0305 (HB0363) More Jobs for Marylanders Act 2.0 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0648 /CH0681 (HB1481/CH0680) Real Property - New Home Sales - Information on Energy-Efficient Options Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0846 /CH0077 (HB1482/CH0078) State Real Estate Commission – Brokers – Business Succession in the Event of Disability Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 77
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM