Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Reapportionment and Redistricting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0009 (SB0112)
Title
Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting
Sponsor
Delegate McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0367
Title
Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0385 (SB0252)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0535
Title
House Legislative Districts - Single Member
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0622
Title
Potomac Compact for Fair Representation
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0962
Title
Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0966
Title
Legislative and Congressional Districting
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 (HB0009)
Title
Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0146
Title
Congressional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0252 (HB0385)
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1023
Title
Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0009 (SB0112) Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting Delegate McCray 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0367 Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0385 (SB0252) Redistricting Reform Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0535 House Legislative Districts - Single Member Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0622 Potomac Compact for Fair Representation Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0962 Elections - Study Commission on the Redistricting Process in Maryland Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0966 Legislative and Congressional Districting Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 (HB0009) Baltimore City - Police Districts - Redistricting Senator McFadden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/26/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0146 Congressional Districting Process Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0252 (HB0385) Redistricting Reform Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1023 Independent Congressional Redistricting Commission - Mid-Atlantic States Regional Districting Process Senator Zucker 2 2 Veto sustained (0-45)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2017 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2017 - 2:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:49 PM