Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Recordation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0088 (SB0199/CH0205)
Title
Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior Liens
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106 (SB0391)
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0372 /CH0453 (SB0202/CH0452)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0419 /CH0370
Title
Personal Property Tax - Liens for Unpaid Tax
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0621 /CH0625 (SB0627)
Title
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract Program
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794 /CH0640 (SB0696)
Title
Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - Liens
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0857 /CH0644
Title
Estates and Trusts - Posthumously Conceived Child
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0946
Title
Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer on Death Act
Sponsor
Delegate Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1008
Title
Real Property - Foreclosure - Mortgage Foreclosure Property Values Protection Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1130 /CH0541 (SB0758/CH0540)
Title
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209 /CH0268 (SB0436/CH0267)
Title
Recordation Taxes - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1236 /CH0532 (SB0730/CH0531)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Low Income Housing Projects - Controlling Interest
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0028
Title
Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0199 /CH0205 (HB0088)
Title
Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior Liens
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0202 /CH0452 (HB0372/CH0453)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0391 (HB0106)
Title
Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0436 /CH0267 (HB1209/CH0268)
Title
Recordation Taxes - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0627 (HB0621/CH0625)
Title
Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract Program
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0696 (HB0794/CH0640)
Title
Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - Liens
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0730 /CH0531 (HB1236/CH0532)
Title
Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Low Income Housing Projects - Controlling Interest
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0758 /CH0540 (HB1130/CH0541)
Title
Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0994
Title
Inheritance, Recordation, and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions for Domestic Partners - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0088 (SB0199/CH0205) Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior Liens Delegate Arora 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0106 (SB0391) Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0372 /CH0453 (SB0202/CH0452) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - Exemption Delegate Barve 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 453
Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0419 /CH0370 Personal Property Tax - Liens for Unpaid Tax Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Ways and Means
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/02/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0621 /CH0625 (SB0627) Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract Program Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 625
Economic Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/08/2013 - 1:30 PM
HB0794 /CH0640 (SB0696) Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - Liens Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 640
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0857 /CH0644 Estates and Trusts - Posthumously Conceived Child Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 644
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0946 Maryland Uniform Real Property Transfer on Death Act Delegate Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1008 Real Property - Foreclosure - Mortgage Foreclosure Property Values Protection Act of 2013 Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1130 /CH0541 (SB0758/CH0540) Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - Establishment Delegate Barnes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 541
Economic Matters
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Finance
HB1209 /CH0268 (SB0436/CH0267) Recordation Taxes - Exemptions Delegate Frick 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Ways and Means
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1236 /CH0532 (SB0730/CH0531) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Low Income Housing Projects - Controlling Interest Delegate Hixson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Ways and Means
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0028 Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Judicial Proceedings
1/29/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0199 /CH0205 (HB0088) Real Property - Refinance Mortgage - Priority over Junior Liens Senator Frosh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 205
Judicial Proceedings
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0202 /CH0452 (HB0372/CH0453) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Transfer of Property Between Related Entities - Exemption Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 452
Budget and Taxation
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0391 (HB0106) Sustainable Growth and Agricultural Preservation Act of 2012 - Repeal Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0436 /CH0267 (HB1209/CH0268) Recordation Taxes - Exemptions Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 267
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0627 (HB0621/CH0625) Maryland Energy Administration - Regulated Sustainable Energy Contract Program Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0696 (HB0794/CH0640) Manufactured Homes - Affixation to Real Property - Liens Senator Stone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0730 /CH0531 (HB1236/CH0532) Recordation and Transfer Taxes - Low Income Housing Projects - Controlling Interest Senator King 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2013 - 1:15 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0758 /CH0540 (HB1130/CH0541) Labor and Employment - Lien for Unpaid Wages - Establishment Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Economic Matters
SB0994 Inheritance, Recordation, and Transfer Taxes - Exemptions for Domestic Partners - Repeal Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM