Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Recordation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0873 (SB0659/CH0720)
Title
Corporations – Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0948 /CH0316
Title
Estates and Trusts – Transfer From Revocable Trust – Exemption From Taxes and Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1241 (SB0971)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Recordation and Filing - Proof of Occupational or Professional License or Admission to Bar
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371
Title
Recordation Tax - Collection by State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0372 /CH0315
Title
Estates and Trusts – Transfer From Revocable Trust – Exemption From Taxes and Fees
Sponsor
Senator Kasemeyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0578 /CH0424 (HB0633/CH0423)
Title
Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0621 /CH0636
Title
Real Property - Deletion of Ownership Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National Origin
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0953
Title
Recordation Tax – Collection by State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0971 (HB1241)
Title
Corporations and Associations – Recordation and Filing – Proof of Occupational or Professional License
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0999 /CH0594
Title
Recordation Tax - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0873 (SB0659/CH0720) Corporations – Transfer of Assets and Exchange of Shares of Stock Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0948 /CH0316 Estates and Trusts – Transfer From Revocable Trust – Exemption From Taxes and Fees Delegate Morgan 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1241 (SB0971) Corporations and Associations - Recordation and Filing - Proof of Occupational or Professional License or Admission to Bar Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1371 Recordation Tax - Collection by State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Distribution Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0372 /CH0315 Estates and Trusts – Transfer From Revocable Trust – Exemption From Taxes and Fees Senator Kasemeyer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0578 /CH0424 (HB0633/CH0423) Secretary of State – Address Confidentiality Programs – Shielding of Real Property Records Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 424
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0621 /CH0636 Real Property - Deletion of Ownership Restrictions Based on Race, Religious Belief, or National Origin Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 636
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0953 Recordation Tax – Collection by State Department of Assessments and Taxation – Distribution Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Conference Committee Appointed
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2018 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0971 (HB1241) Corporations and Associations – Recordation and Filing – Proof of Occupational or Professional License Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0999 /CH0594 Recordation Tax - Exemptions Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 594
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM