Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Recordings -see also- Video

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0175 /CH0806
Title
Prince George’s County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Intersection of Old Fort Road and Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 302–18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0192 (SB0781)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims and Witnesses - Out of Court Statement of Child Victim
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0704
Title
General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0715
Title
Public Service Commission - Application for a Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Public Notice and Hearing
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0791 (SB0748)
Title
Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139
Title
Baltimore City – Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems – Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1142 (SB0720)
Title
Interception of Oral Communication – Law Enforcement Officer
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1151
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1365
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Operation in School Zones (Truth in Speed Cameras Act of 2018)
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1784
Title
Life Insurance - Sale by Telephone
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107
Title
Public Safety - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0720 (HB1142)
Title
Interception of Oral Communication – Law Enforcement Officer
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0748 (HB0791)
Title
Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0781 (HB0192)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims and Witnesses - Out of Court Statement of Child Victim
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0175 /CH0806 Prince George’s County – Speed Monitoring Systems – Intersection of Old Fort Road and Maryland Route 210 (Indian Head Highway) PG 302–18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 806
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0192 (SB0781) Criminal Procedure - Victims and Witnesses - Out of Court Statement of Child Victim Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/30/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0704 General Assembly - Live and Archived Video Streaming of Meetings Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/26/2018 - 3:00 PM
HB0715 Public Service Commission - Application for a Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Public Notice and Hearing Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0791 (SB0748) Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions Delegate Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
Economic Matters
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0887 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1139 Baltimore City – Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems – Enforcement Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1142 (SB0720) Interception of Oral Communication – Law Enforcement Officer Delegate Malone 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (42-2)
Judiciary
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1151 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1365 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring Systems - Operation in School Zones (Truth in Speed Cameras Act of 2018) Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1784 Life Insurance - Sale by Telephone Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0107 Public Safety - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention and the Maryland Statistical Analysis Center - Reporting Requirements Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (119-0)
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0720 (HB1142) Interception of Oral Communication – Law Enforcement Officer Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0748 (HB0791) Interception of Communication - Financial Institutions Senator Astle 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0781 (HB0192) Criminal Procedure - Victims and Witnesses - Out of Court Statement of Child Victim Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0816 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM