Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Recycling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0135
Title
Environment - Motor Vehicle Batteries - Recycling
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0184 /CH0279 (SB0484/CH0278)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1085 (SB0641)
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1086 (SB0576)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087
Title
Recycling - Bars and Restaurants - Beverage Containers
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1088 /CH0146
Title
Business Regulation - Returnable Containers and Returnable Textiles - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266 (SB0799)
Title
Energy - Landfill Diversion - Municipal Solid Waste Portfolio Standard
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1369 (SB0925)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Prince George's County - Community Forklift Project
Sponsor
Delegate Gaines
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1440 /CH0686
Title
Recycling - Composting Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0484 /CH0278 (HB0184/CH0279)
Title
Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0576 (HB1086)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0641 (HB1085)
Title
Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0799 (HB1266)
Title
Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0925 (HB1369)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Prince George's County - Community Forklift Project
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1049 /CH0602
Title
Recycling - Apartment Buildings and Condominiums - Ocean City
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0135 Environment - Motor Vehicle Batteries - Recycling Delegate Miller, A. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0184 /CH0279 (SB0484/CH0278) Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 279
Ways and Means
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1085 (SB0641) Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1086 (SB0576) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013 Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters)
Environmental Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1087 Recycling - Bars and Restaurants - Beverage Containers Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1088 /CH0146 Business Regulation - Returnable Containers and Returnable Textiles - Revisions Delegate Niemann 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 146
Economic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1266 (SB0799) Energy - Landfill Diversion - Municipal Solid Waste Portfolio Standard Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1369 (SB0925) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Prince George's County - Community Forklift Project Delegate Gaines 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1440 /CH0686 Recycling - Composting Facilities Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 686
Environmental Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0484 /CH0278 (HB0184/CH0279) Income Tax Credit - Oyster Shell Recycling Senator Dyson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 278
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0576 (HB1086) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2013 Senator Raskin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0641 (HB1085) Statewide Container Recycling Incentive Program Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0799 (HB1266) Environment - Solid Waste Management Practices - Maryland Recycling and Landfill Diversion Task Force Senator Middleton 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Finance
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
SB0925 (HB1369) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2010 - Prince George's County - Community Forklift Project Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1049 /CH0602 Recycling - Apartment Buildings and Condominiums - Ocean City Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 602
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM