Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Recycling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0572 /CH0603 (SB0153/CH0604)
Title
Income Tax – Oyster Shell Recycling Credit – Maximum Allowable Amount and Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Rey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0850
Title
Solid Waste Management and Recycling – Mattresses and Box Springs
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1242
Title
Solar Photovoltaic Recycling
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0153 /CH0604 (HB0572/CH0603)
Title
Income Tax – Oyster Shell Recycling Credit – Maximum Allowable Amount and Sunset Extension
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0844 /CH0630
Title
Environment - Newsprint Recycling Board - Repeal and Transfer of Authority
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0572 /CH0603 (SB0153/CH0604) Income Tax – Oyster Shell Recycling Credit – Maximum Allowable Amount and Sunset Extension Delegate Rey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 603
Ways and Means
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0850 Solid Waste Management and Recycling – Mattresses and Box Springs Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1242 Solar Photovoltaic Recycling Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB0153 /CH0604 (HB0572/CH0603) Income Tax – Oyster Shell Recycling Credit – Maximum Allowable Amount and Sunset Extension Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Budget and Taxation
1/31/2018 - 2:30 PM
Ways and Means
3/21/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0844 /CH0630 Environment - Newsprint Recycling Board - Repeal and Transfer of Authority Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 630
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:53 PM