Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Refuse Disposal -see also- Recycling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0257 (SB0702/CH0048)
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal System
Sponsor
Baltimore County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458
Title
Environment - Exploration and Production Waste and Waste From Hydraulic Fracturing
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0551 (SB0620)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2015
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603
Title
Yard Waste and Food Residuals Diversion and Infrastructure Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796
Title
Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Executive Director and General Counsel - Appointment and Compensation
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1019 (SB0532)
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509
Title
Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Purpose, Appointments, and Compensation
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 (HB1019)
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0620 (HB0551)
Title
Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2015
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0702 /CH0048 (HB0257)
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal System
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0257 (SB0702/CH0048) Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal System Baltimore County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
2/18/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules
HB0458 Environment - Exploration and Production Waste and Waste From Hydraulic Fracturing Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0551 (SB0620) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2015 Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB0603 Yard Waste and Food Residuals Diversion and Infrastructure Task Force Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0796 Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Executive Director and General Counsel - Appointment and Compensation Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1019 (SB0532) Farmers' Rights Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
SB0509 Northeast Maryland Waste Disposal Authority - Purpose, Appointments, and Compensation Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0532 (HB1019) Farmers' Rights Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0620 (HB0551) Community Cleanup and Greening Act of 2015 Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0702 /CH0048 (HB0257) Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal System Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 48
Budget and Taxation
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM