Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Refuse Disposal -see also- Recycling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0109 /CH0579 (SB0285/CH0580)
Title
Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0289 /CH0614 (SB0273/CH0615)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0444
Title
Prince George's County - State Highways - Mowing, Maintenance, and Litter Removal PG 419-19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0502
Title
Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattresses and Box Springs
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0510 /CH0366
Title
Organic Waste – Organics Recycling – Collection and Acceptance for Final Disposal
Sponsor
Delegate Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0921 (SB1036)
Title
Environment - Conowingo Dam - Water Quality Certification
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1085
Title
Drug Manufacturers - Drug Take-Back Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1142
Title
Environment - Hazardous Materials - Disposal of Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183
Title
Recycling - Lodging Establishments - Notification to Guests
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 /CH0615 (HB0289/CH0614)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0353
Title
On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Construction and Inspection Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0370 /CH0500
Title
Environment – Recycling – Office Buildings
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0563 (HB1419)
Title
Zoning - Special Exceptions - Construction or Operation of Landfills
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1036 (HB0921)
Title
Environment - Conowingo Dam - Water Quality Certification
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0109 /CH0579 (SB0285/CH0580) Environment – Expanded Polystyrene Food Service Products – Prohibitions Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 579
Environment and Transportation
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0289 /CH0614 (SB0273/CH0615) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 614
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0444 Prince George's County - State Highways - Mowing, Maintenance, and Litter Removal PG 419-19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0502 Environment - Office of Recycling - Mattresses and Box Springs Delegate Hill 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0510 /CH0366 Organic Waste – Organics Recycling – Collection and Acceptance for Final Disposal Delegate Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0921 (SB1036) Environment - Conowingo Dam - Water Quality Certification Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1085 Drug Manufacturers - Drug Take-Back Programs Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1142 Environment - Hazardous Materials - Disposal of Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0183 Recycling - Lodging Establishments - Notification to Guests Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0273 /CH0615 (HB0289/CH0614) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Cinema/Theater License Senator Young 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 615
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0353 On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Construction and Inspection Licenses Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0370 /CH0500 Environment – Recycling – Office Buildings Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 500
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0563 (HB1419) Zoning - Special Exceptions - Construction or Operation of Landfills Senator Patterson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1036 (HB0921) Environment - Conowingo Dam - Water Quality Certification Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM