Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Registers of Wills

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0084 (SB0116/CH0049)
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0486
Title
Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Retention of Estate Files
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0485
Title
Estates and Trusts - Register of Wills - Admission of Copy of Executed Will
Sponsor
Delegate Miele
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116 /CH0049 (HB0084)
Title
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0084 (SB0116/CH0049) State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements Speaker 6 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Appropriations
2/02/2016 - 12:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0472 /CH0486 Estates and Trusts - Registers of Wills - Retention of Estate Files Delegate Miele 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0485 Estates and Trusts - Register of Wills - Admission of Copy of Executed Will Delegate Miele 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
SB0116 /CH0049 (HB0084) State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Alterations in Audit Requirements President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2016 - 2:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM
Click to return on the top page