Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Religion -see also- Places of Worship

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057 (SB0556)
Title
State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0240 /CH0028 (SB0232/CH0029)
Title
Hate Crimes – Threats
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0273
Title
Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0295 (SB0848)
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0317 (SB0271)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0332 /CH0540 (SB0158)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0522 /CH0230
Title
Public Health - Food Establishments - Licensing
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0679 /CH0222 (SB0872)
Title
Workplace Harassment – Prohibitions, Liability, Enforcement, and Prevention Training
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766
Title
Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Haynes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1069
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Required Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058)
Title
Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0158 (HB0332/CH0540)
Title
Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0232 /CH0029 (HB0240/CH0028)
Title
Hate Crimes – Threats
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0271 (HB0317)
Title
Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 (HB0057)
Title
State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0848 (HB0295)
Title
Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872 (HB0679/CH0222)
Title
Workplace Harassment - Prohibitions, Liability, and Enforcement
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413)
Title
The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0057 (SB0556) State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying Speaker 6 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB0058 (SB0112/CH0006) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions Speaker 6 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/25/2019 - 2:00 PM
HB0240 /CH0028 (SB0232/CH0029) Hate Crimes – Threats Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 28
Judiciary
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0273 Anne Arundel County - Solicitation of Money or Donations From Occupants of Vehicles - Prohibitions and Permit Program Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0295 (SB0848) Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Ways and Means
2/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0317 (SB0271) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Health and Government Operations
2/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0332 /CH0540 (SB0158) Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program Delegate McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 540
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0522 /CH0230 Public Health - Food Establishments - Licensing Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 230
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0679 /CH0222 (SB0872) Workplace Harassment – Prohibitions, Liability, Enforcement, and Prevention Training Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 222
Appropriations
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
HB0766 Education - Community Colleges - Collective Bargaining Delegate Haynes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
HB1069 Child Abuse and Neglect - Required Reporting Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
2/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 /CH0006 (HB0058) Mandated Reports and Statutory Commissions, Councils, and Committees - Revisions President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 6
Rules
2/13/2019 - 11:00 AM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2019 - 2:00 PM
SB0158 (HB0332/CH0540) Maryland Department of Health - Community Dental Clinics Grant Program Senator Guzzone 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Finance
2/06/2019 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0232 /CH0029 (HB0240/CH0028) Hate Crimes – Threats Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 29
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0271 (HB0317) Maryland Commission on Civil Rights - Civil Penalties Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0556 (HB0057) State Government - Legislative and Executive Branches - Workplace Bullying Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0848 (HB0295) Nonpublic Elementary and Secondary Schools - Discrimination - Prohibition Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/14/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0872 (HB0679/CH0222) Workplace Harassment - Prohibitions, Liability, and Enforcement President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB1030 /CH0771 (HB1413) The Blueprint for Maryland’s Future President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 771
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2019 - 4:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM