Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Repeate Offenders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0230 (SB0163)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236 (SB0166)
Title
Crimes - Use of a Firearm in the Commission of a Crime of Violence or Felony - Penalties (The Repeat Firearms Offender Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0239
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Animal Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0310
Title
Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0368 (SB0248)
Title
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0606 /CH0253
Title
Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0632
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and Sale
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0707 /CH0020
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving Offenses – Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0722
Title
Criminal Law - Theft of a Firearm
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1155 /CH0160
Title
Prince George’s County – Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items – Penalties PG 418–19
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1182
Title
Maryland Stepping Up to Reduce Mental Illness in Correctional Facilities Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0163 (HB0230)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2019)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166 (HB0236)
Title
Crimes - Use of a Firearm in the Commission of a Crime of Violence or Felony - Penalties (The Repeat Firearms Offender Act of 2019)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0248 (HB0368)
Title
Criminal Law – Life–Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel – Criminal Negligence (Wade’s Law)
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Criminal Law - Neighborhood Nuisance - Civil Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0856 /CH0252
Title
Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0230 (SB0163) Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2019) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0236 (SB0166) Crimes - Use of a Firearm in the Commission of a Crime of Violence or Felony - Penalties (The Repeat Firearms Offender Act of 2019) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 10:00 a.m.
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
HB0239 Criminal Procedure - Maryland Animal Abuse Registry Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0310 Task Force to Study Impaired Driving and New Technologies Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0368 (SB0248) Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0606 /CH0253 Juvenile Justice Reform Council Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 253
Judiciary
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0632 Constitutional Amendment - Cannabis - Use, Possession, Cultivation, and Sale Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0707 /CH0020 Drunk and Drugged Driving Offenses – Penalties Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 20
Judiciary
3/14/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB0722 Criminal Law - Theft of a Firearm Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/25/2019 - 10:00 AM
HB1155 /CH0160 Prince George’s County – Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items – Penalties PG 418–19 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Environment and Transportation
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1182 Maryland Stepping Up to Reduce Mental Illness in Correctional Facilities Commission Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
SB0163 (HB0230) Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Subsequent Offenders - Felonies (Repeat Drunk Driving Offenders Act of 2019) President 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0166 (HB0236) Crimes - Use of a Firearm in the Commission of a Crime of Violence or Felony - Penalties (The Repeat Firearms Offender Act of 2019) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0248 (HB0368) Criminal Law – Life–Threatening Injury Involving a Vehicle or Vessel – Criminal Negligence (Wade’s Law) Senator Carozza 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2019 - 12:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0692 Criminal Law - Neighborhood Nuisance - Civil Penalties Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0856 /CH0252 Juvenile Justice Reform Council Senator Zirkin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2019 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM