Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Rescue Squads -see also- Ambulances; Emergency Medical Serv

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050
Title
Hate Crimes - Prohibitions and Protected Classes - Expansion to Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0227 (SB1166)
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0232 /CH0412 (SB0605/CH0411)
Title
Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - Approval
Sponsor
Delegate Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0383 /CH0674 (SB0426/CH0673)
Title
Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Annapolis
Sponsor
Delegate Busch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0419 (SB0822)
Title
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management Services
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0838
Title
Civil Immunity - Emergency Care for Drug Overdose - Protocols
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0868 /CH0071 (SB0516/CH0070)
Title
Washington County - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Service - Local Authority
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1384
Title
Baltimore City - Registration of Volunteer Rescue Squads
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1472
Title
Fire Safety Construction Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Branch
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1481 (SB0723)
Title
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Entering a Property to Provide Emergency Assistance or Medical Care
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1541
Title
Higher Education - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Personnel - Partial Tuition Waiver
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1571
Title
Property Tax Credit - Disabled Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Acquisition of Dwelling
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1626
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Fallen or Disabled Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Acquisition of Dwelling
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 (HB0220)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0426 /CH0673 (HB0383/CH0674)
Title
Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Annapolis
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0516 /CH0070 (HB0868/CH0071)
Title
Washington County - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Service - Local Authority
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0605 /CH0411 (HB0232/CH0412)
Title
Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - Approval
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0723 (HB1481)
Title
Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Entering a Property to Provide Emergency Assistance or Medical Care
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0822 (HB0419)
Title
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management Services
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1166 (HB0227)
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0050 Hate Crimes - Prohibitions and Protected Classes - Expansion to Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/19/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0227 (SB1166) Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0232 /CH0412 (SB0605/CH0411) Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - Approval Delegate Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 412
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2016 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0383 /CH0674 (SB0426/CH0673) Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Annapolis Delegate Busch 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 674
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0419 (SB0822) Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management Services Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0838 Civil Immunity - Emergency Care for Drug Overdose - Protocols Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0868 /CH0071 (SB0516/CH0070) Washington County - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Service - Local Authority Delegate McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1384 Baltimore City - Registration of Volunteer Rescue Squads Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1472 Fire Safety Construction Act of 2016 Delegate Branch 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1481 (SB0723) Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Entering a Property to Provide Emergency Assistance or Medical Care Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1541 Higher Education - Volunteer Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Medical Services Personnel - Partial Tuition Waiver Allegany County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1571 Property Tax Credit - Disabled Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Acquisition of Dwelling Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1626 Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Fallen or Disabled Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Acquisition of Dwelling Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0328 (HB0220) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0426 /CH0673 (HB0383/CH0674) Maryland Emergency Management Assistance Compact - City of Annapolis Senator Astle 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 673
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0516 /CH0070 (HB0868/CH0071) Washington County - Fire, Rescue, and Ambulance Service - Local Authority Washington County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 70
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0605 /CH0411 (HB0232/CH0412) Athletic Trainers - Evaluation and Treatment Protocols - Approval Senator Bates 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 411
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0656 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0723 (HB1481) Civil Actions - Immunity From Liability - Entering a Property to Provide Emergency Assistance or Medical Care Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0822 (HB0419) Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management Services Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1166 (HB0227) Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Retirement Income of Law Enforcement, Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM