Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Respite Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0556 (SB0418/CH0059)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Low Intensity Support Services - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418 /CH0059 (HB0556)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Low Intensity Support Services - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0556 (SB0418/CH0059) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Low Intensity Support Services - Funding Delegate Hammen 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Health and Government Operations
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0418 /CH0059 (HB0556) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Low Intensity Support Services - Funding Senator Middleton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 59
Finance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM