Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Restitution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0202
Title
Criminal Law - Malicious Destruction of Property - Transit Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Stukes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0250 /CH0363
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Remedy and Priority of Restitution
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0291 /CH0465 (SB0383/CH0464)
Title
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services Act
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0435
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Restitution
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0541 (SB0571)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0737
Title
Crimes - Malicious Destruction of Property by Graffiti - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0921 /CH0652 (SB0258)
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942 /CH0301 (SB0624/CH0300)
Title
Identity Fraud - Health Information and Health Care Records
Sponsor
Delegate Lee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1211 /CH0486 (SB0489/CH0485)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Schulz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0258 (HB0921/CH0652)
Title
Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of Crime
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159)
Title
Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0383 /CH0464 (HB0291/CH0465)
Title
Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0489 /CH0485 (HB1211/CH0486)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law)
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0571 (HB0541)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Rehabilitation
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0624 /CH0300 (HB0942/CH0301)
Title
Identity Fraud - Health Information and Health Care Records
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664
Title
Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0818
Title
Community Juvenile Services Program
Sponsor
Senator Frosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0202 Criminal Law - Malicious Destruction of Property - Transit Vehicles Delegate Stukes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0228 /CH0159 (SB0274) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 159
Health and Government Operations
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0250 /CH0363 Criminal Procedure - Victims' Rights - Remedy and Priority of Restitution Delegate Smigiel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Judiciary
2/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0291 /CH0465 (SB0383/CH0464) Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services Act Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Environmental Matters
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0435 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Restitution Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0541 (SB0571) Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion Delegate Hough 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0737 Crimes - Malicious Destruction of Property by Graffiti - Penalties Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0866 Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0921 /CH0652 (SB0258) Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of Crime Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 652
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0942 /CH0301 (SB0624/CH0300) Identity Fraud - Health Information and Health Care Records Delegate Lee 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1211 /CH0486 (SB0489/CH0485) Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law) Delegate Schulz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Judiciary
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0258 (HB0921/CH0652) Correctional Services - Inmate Earnings - Compensation for Victims of Crime Senator Shank 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0274 (HB0228/CH0159) Maryland Health Progress Act of 2013 President 3 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0383 /CH0464 (HB0291/CH0465) Real Property - Maryland Mortgage Assistance Relief Services Act Senator Raskin 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 464
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Environmental Matters
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0489 /CH0485 (HB1211/CH0486) Estates and Trusts - Slayer's Statute (Ann Sue Metz Law) Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 485
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0571 (HB0541) Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Rehabilitation Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0624 /CH0300 (HB0942/CH0301) Identity Fraud - Health Information and Health Care Records Senator Pugh 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 300
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0664 Procurement - Prevailing Wage Rate Law - Repeal Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0818 Community Juvenile Services Program Senator Frosh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM