Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Restitution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0278
Title
Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0565
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Restitution
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603 (SB0490/CH0174)
Title
Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers
Sponsor
Delegate Jameson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0705 (SB0940/CH0207)
Title
Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0795
Title
Task Force on the Fiscal Impact Associated With Animal Cruelty Cases
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0921 (SB0398/CH0162)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion
Sponsor
Delegate Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1070
Title
Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Cigarette Restitution Fund - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1326 (SB0754)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371
Title
Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets
Sponsor
Delegate Arora
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0099 /CH0026
Title
Insurance - Fraud Violations - Civil and Criminal Actions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0204
Title
Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0325
Title
Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age
Sponsor
Senator Forehand
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0398 /CH0162 (HB0921)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0490 /CH0174 (HB0603)
Title
Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0513
Title
Task Force on the Fiscal Impact Associated With Animal Cruelty Cases
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566
Title
Criminal Law - Littering - Mandatory Public Service
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0735
Title
Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754 (HB1326)
Title
Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0940 /CH0207 (HB0705)
Title
Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0278 Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0565 Vehicle Laws - Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Restitution Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0603 (SB0490/CH0174) Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers Delegate Jameson 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0705 (SB0940/CH0207) Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0795 Task Force on the Fiscal Impact Associated With Animal Cruelty Cases Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/20/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0921 (SB0398/CH0162) Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion Delegate Hough 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1070 Department of Health and Mental Hygiene - Cigarette Restitution Fund - Report Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1326 (SB0754) Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/10/2014 - 2:00 PM
Environmental Matters
HB1371 Criminal Procedure - Financial Crimes Against Vulnerable and Elder Adults - Petition to Freeze Assets Delegate Arora 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0099 /CH0026 Insurance - Fraud Violations - Civil and Criminal Actions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 26
Finance
1/16/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0204 Prevailing Wage Rates Reform Act of 2014 Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0325 Criminal Law - Tobacco Products - Minimum Age Senator Forehand 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0398 /CH0162 (HB0921) Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion Senator Shank 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 162
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0490 /CH0174 (HB0603) Limited Lines Insurance Licenses - Self-Service Storage Producers Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174
Finance
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0513 Task Force on the Fiscal Impact Associated With Animal Cruelty Cases Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0566 Criminal Law - Littering - Mandatory Public Service Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0735 Tobacco-Related Disease Products Research, Development, and Commercialization Program Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Finance
SB0754 (HB1326) Public-Private Partnerships - Disclosure of Involvement in Deportations - Requirement Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0940 /CH0207 (HB0705) Victims of Crime - Legal Representatives of Minors and Disabled and Elderly Persons Senator Stone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 207
Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
4/07/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:42 PM