Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Review Boards

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0540 (SB0511/CH0172)
Title
Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0680 /CH0686 (SB0433/CH0687)
Title
State Procurement – State Funded Construction Projects – Payment of Employee Health Care Expenses
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1094 (SB0793/CH0025)
Title
Community Safety and Strengthening Act
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1343 (SB1000)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1371
Title
Baltimore City - Public Safety Community Oversight Board
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1382
Title
Law Enforcement Officers – Public Information
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511 /CH0172 (HB0540)
Title
Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0575
Title
Criminal Procedure - Plea Agreement Terms and the Violence Prevention Initiative Criteria
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0793 /CH0025 (HB1094)
Title
Community Safety and Strengthening Act
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0834
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Accountability - Civilian Oversight
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843
Title
Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1000 (HB1343)
Title
Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0540 (SB0511/CH0172) Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Appropriations
3/05/2019 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0680 /CH0686 (SB0433/CH0687) State Procurement – State Funded Construction Projects – Payment of Employee Health Care Expenses Delegate Cullison 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 686
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1094 (SB0793/CH0025) Community Safety and Strengthening Act Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 11:30 a.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2019 - 11:30 AM
HB1343 (SB1000) Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judiciary
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1371 Baltimore City - Public Safety Community Oversight Board Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1382 Law Enforcement Officers – Public Information Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0511 /CH0172 (HB0540) Cecil County - Correctional Deputy Sheriffs - Collective Bargaining Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 172
Finance
3/01/2019 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0575 Criminal Procedure - Plea Agreement Terms and the Violence Prevention Initiative Criteria Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0793 /CH0025 (HB1094) Community Safety and Strengthening Act Senator Hayes 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 25
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2019 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0834 Public Safety - Law Enforcement Accountability - Civilian Oversight Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB0843 Baltimore City - Community Oversight and Accountability Commission of Baltimore City Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2019 - 12:00 PM
SB1000 (HB1343) Public Safety - Handgun Permit Review Board - Repeal Senator Beidle 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Executive Nominations
3/08/2019 - 9:00 AM
Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:34 PM