Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Rivers and Streams

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050 (SB0464)
Title
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0055 (SB0316)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption (Anne Arundel County Rain Tax Exemption Act of 2014)
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0097 (SB0005)
Title
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0155
Title
Environment - Stormwater Management - Exemption From Watershed Protection and Restoration Program
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0324 (SB0277)
Title
Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0895
Title
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0952
Title
Baltimore County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1139
Title
Environment - Stormwater Remediation Fees - Reduction of Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Olszewski
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1283 (SB0960/CH0075)
Title
Environment - Cox Creek Citizens Oversight Committee - Composition
Sponsor
Delegate Hammen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0006 (SJ0004)
Title
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - Dredging
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0005 (HB0097)
Title
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Kittleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277 (HB0324)
Title
Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Brinkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0316 (HB0055)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption (Anne Arundel County Rain Tax Exemption Act of 2014)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0464 (HB0050)
Title
Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0960 /CH0075 (HB1283)
Title
Environment - Cox Creek Citizens Oversight Committee - Composition
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1116
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0004 (HJ0006)
Title
Conowingo Dam - Sediment - Dredging
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0050 (SB0464) Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal Delegate Norman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0055 (SB0316) Anne Arundel County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption (Anne Arundel County Rain Tax Exemption Act of 2014) Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
HB0097 (SB0005) Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal Delegate Bates 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0155 Environment - Stormwater Management - Exemption From Watershed Protection and Restoration Program Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0324 (SB0277) Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0895 Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0952 Baltimore County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB1139 Environment - Stormwater Remediation Fees - Reduction of Fees Delegate Olszewski 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1283 (SB0960/CH0075) Environment - Cox Creek Citizens Oversight Committee - Composition Delegate Hammen 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HJ0006 (SJ0004) Conowingo Dam - Sediment - Dredging Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
2/24/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0005 (HB0097) Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal Senator Kittleman 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0277 (HB0324) Frederick County - Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption Senator Brinkley 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 PM
SB0316 (HB0055) Anne Arundel County - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Exemption (Anne Arundel County Rain Tax Exemption Act of 2014) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/28/2014 - 1:45 PM
SB0464 (HB0050) Stormwater Management - Watershed Protection and Restoration Program - Repeal Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0960 /CH0075 (HB1283) Environment - Cox Creek Citizens Oversight Committee - Composition Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 75
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1116 Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SJ0004 (HJ0006) Conowingo Dam - Sediment - Dredging Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/31/2014 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM