Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Rivers and Streams

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0125 /CH0377
Title
Environment - Emergency Action Plans for Dams
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0164
Title
Environment - Lynch Cove Run - Soil Testing
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0281 (SB0266)
Title
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0567 (SB0115)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Cape St. Claire Beach Replenishment
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885
Title
Environment - Chesapeake Bay - Vessel Sewage Discharge Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Howard, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1339 (SB0554)
Title
Natural Resources - Gill Nets - Stretched Mesh Size
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0115 (HB0567)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Cape St. Claire Beach Replenishment
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0266 (HB0281)
Title
Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0554 (HB1339)
Title
Natural Resources - Gill Nets - Mesh Size
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0125 /CH0377 Environment - Emergency Action Plans for Dams Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0164 Environment - Lynch Cove Run - Soil Testing Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0281 (SB0266) Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal - Prohibition Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0567 (SB0115) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Cape St. Claire Beach Replenishment Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/11/2017 - 9:00 AM
HB0885 Environment - Chesapeake Bay - Vessel Sewage Discharge Areas Delegate Howard, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1339 (SB0554) Natural Resources - Gill Nets - Stretched Mesh Size Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0115 (HB0567) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - Cape St. Claire Beach Replenishment Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2017 - 11:00 AM
SB0266 (HB0281) Environment - On-Site Sewage Disposal Systems - Best Available Technology for Nitrogen Removal Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/31/2017 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0554 (HB1339) Natural Resources - Gill Nets - Mesh Size Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:50 PM