Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Robbery

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0185 (SB0683)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Simmons
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0235
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379
Title
Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1137
Title
Crimes - Robbery or Theft of Property - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1208 (SB0866)
Title
Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary Options
Sponsor
Delegate Swain
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1495
Title
Crimes - Robbery Committed Against Elderly Persons - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0683 (HB0185)
Title
Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0866 (HB1208)
Title
Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary Options
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1048
Title
Crimes - Robbery or Theft of Property - Controlled Dangerous Substances
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0185 (SB0683) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Delegate Simmons 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/21/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0235 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and Correctional Officers Delegate Kelly, K. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0379 Criminal Procedure - Vulnerable Adult Abuse Registry Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1137 Crimes - Robbery or Theft of Property - Controlled Dangerous Substances Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judiciary
2/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1208 (SB0866) Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary Options Delegate Swain 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1495 Crimes - Robbery Committed Against Elderly Persons - Penalties Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0683 (HB0185) Crimes - Committing a Crime of Violence in the Presence of a Minor - Penalties Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0866 (HB1208) Education - Suspension and Expulsion - Restrictions and Alternative Disciplinary Options Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1048 Crimes - Robbery or Theft of Property - Controlled Dangerous Substances Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM